EP1699523 - CREATION OF A BIOLOGICAL ATRIOVENTRICULAR BYPASS TO COMPENSATE FOR ATRIOVENTRICULAR BLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York West 116th Street and Broadway New York New York 10027 / US | For all designated states THE RESEARCH FOUNDATION OF STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK Off. Tech. Licensing & Ind. Rel. N5002 Melville Library Stony Brook, NY 11794-3369 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York West 116th Street and Broadway New York New York 10027 / US | ||
For all designated states THE RESEARCH FOUNDATION OF STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK Off. Tech. Licensing & Ind. Rel. N5002 Melville Library Stony Brook, NY 11794-3369 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRINK, Peter, R. 101 Dyke Road Setauket, NY 11733 / US | 02 /
COHEN, Ira, S. 23 Hawks Nest Road Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US | 03 /
ROSEN, Michael, R. 25 East 86th Street New York, NY 10028 / US | 04 /
ROBINSON, Richard, B. 67 Roosevelt Street Cresskill, NJ 07626 / US | 05 /
DANILO, Peter, Jr. 81 Stonybrook Road Hopewell, NJ 08525 / US | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Pohlman, Sandra M. Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04818062.4 | 22.12.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004US42953 | Priority number, date | US20030532363P | 24.12.2003 Original published format: US 532363 P | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005062857 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1699523 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/18 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
A61L27/3873 (EP,US);
A61L27/3834 (EP,US);
A61L27/3895 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12N5/0663 (EP,US);
C12N2502/1329 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | 12.07.2006 | BA | 12.07.2006 | HR | 12.07.2006 | LV | 12.07.2006 | MK | 12.07.2006 | YU | 12.07.2006 | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG EINES BIOLOGISCHEN ATRIOVENTRIKULÄREN BYPASS ZUR KOMPENSIERUNG EINES ATRIOVENTRIKULÄREN BLOCKS | [2006/37] | English: | CREATION OF A BIOLOGICAL ATRIOVENTRICULAR BYPASS TO COMPENSATE FOR ATRIOVENTRICULAR BLOCK | [2006/37] | French: | CREATION D'UNE DERIVATION BIOLOGIQUE ATRIOVENTRICULAIRE DESTINEE A COMPENSER LE BLOCAGE ATRIOVENTRICULAIRE | [2006/37] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 08.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6174333 (KADIYALA SUDHAKAR [US], et al) [X] 1-5,12,14-16 * the whole document *; | [PXL]WO2004065580 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [PXL] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [T]WO2008011134 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [T] * the whole document *; | [X] - YOUNG R G ET AL, "USE OF MESENCHYMAL STEM CELLS IN A COLLAGEN MATRIX FOR ACHILLES TENDON REPAIR", JOURNAL OF ORTHOPAEDIC RESEARCH, THE JOURNAL OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY, INC.,, US, (199807), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 0736-0266, pages 406 - 413, XP008005059 [X] 1-5,12,14-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jor.1100160403 | [Y] - WANG J S ET AL, "Marrow stromal cells for cellular cardiomyoplasty: feasibility and potential clinical advantages.", THE JOURNAL OF THORACIC AND CARDIOVASCULAR SURGERY NOV 2000, (200011), vol. 120, no. 5, ISSN 0022-5223, pages 999 - 1005, XP002474742 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1067/mtc.2000.110250 | [Y] - RUHPARWAR ARJANG ET AL, "Transplanted fetal cardiomyocytes as cardiac pacemaker", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CARDIO-THORACIC SURGERY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (200205), vol. 21, no. 5, ISSN 1010-7940, pages 853 - 857, XP002364840 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1010-7940(02)00066-0 | [Y] - MEYER RITA A, "Changes in gap junction communication between human mesenchymal stem cells during differentiation and senescence", DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020715), vol. 247, no. 2, ISSN 0012-1606, page 477, XP009098050 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * | [A] - HASSINK RUTGER J ET AL, "Transplantation of cells for cardiac repair.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY, (20030305), vol. 41, no. 5, ISSN 0735-1097, pages 711 - 717, XP002474743 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0735-1097(02)02933-9 | [A] - TOMA C ET AL, "Human mesenchymal stem cells differentiate to a cardiomyocyte phenotype in the adult murine heart", CIRCULATION, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, DALLAS, TX, US, (20020108), vol. 105, no. 1, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 93 - 98, XP002984364 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/hc0102.101442 | [A] - HEUBACH JUERGEN F ET AL, "Electrophysiological properties of human mesenchymal stem cells.", JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY (CAMBRIDGE), (20031024), vol. 554, no. 3, ISSN 0022-3751, pages 659 - 672, XP002474744 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1113/jphysiol.2003.055806 | [PX] - VALIUNAS V ET AL, "HUMAN MESENCHYMAL STEM CELLS MAKE CARDIAC CONNEXINS AND FORM FUNCTIONAL GAP JUNCTIONS", JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, XX, XX, (20040316), vol. 555, no. 3, ISSN 0022-3751, pages 617 - 626, XP009060449 [PX] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1113/jphysiol.2003.058719 | International search | [YP]US6690970 (TAHERI SYDE A [US], et al); | [Y]US6387369 (PITTENGER MARK F [US], et al) |