EP1683261 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ROTOR POSITION OF A SYNCHRONOUS MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2010/52] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAUDER, Peter Am Heckerpfad 43 55128 Mainz / DE | 02 /
KAUFMANN, Tom In der Heide 19 55595 Winterbach / DE | [2006/30] | Application number, filing date | 04818141.6 | 28.10.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004EP52702 | Priority number, date | DE2003151850 | 06.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10351850 | [2006/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005046043 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1683261 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1683261 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/18, G01D5/20 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
H02P6/185 (EP,US);
G01D5/2006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/07] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG DER ROTORLAGE EINER SYNCHRONMASCHINE | [2006/30] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ROTOR POSITION OF A SYNCHRONOUS MACHINE | [2006/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE LA POSITION DU ROTOR D'UNE MACHINE SYNCHRONE | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]AT395487B (ELIN ENERGIEANWENDUNG [AT]) [A] 1-17* page 6, lines 15-45; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]EP0793337 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6-8 * column 17, lines 42-54; figures 1,5 * * column 18, lines 17-42; figure 16 * * column 18, line 43 - column 19, line 5 * * column 11, lines 4-23; figures 4,5 * * figures 6-8,11 * [A] 2-5,9-17; | [A]EP1160966 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CH]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] , [0061]; figures 1-4 * |