EP1690242 - METHOD FOR MONITORING THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE FLIGHT PLAN OF A CO-OPERATING AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 45, rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly Sur Seine / FR | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEKER, Guy, THALES Intellectual Property 31/33 Avenue Aristide Briand F-94117 ARCUEIL Cedex / FR | 02 /
VANYPRE, Dominique, THALES Intellectual Property 31/33 Avenue Aristide Briand F-94117 ARCUEIL Cedex / FR | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Brunelli, Gérald, et al Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Brunelli, Gérald, et al Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/33] | Beylot, Jacques Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04818150.7 | 03.11.2004 | [2006/33] | WO2004EP52761 | Priority number, date | FR20030012930 | 04.11.2003 Original published format: FR 0312930 | [2006/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005045785 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1690242 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/06, G08G5/00 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
G08G5/0013 (EP,US);
G08G5/0039 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/33] | G08G5/04, G01C23/00, G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2007/06] |
Former [2006/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER ENTWICKLUNG DES FLUGPLANS EINES KOOPERIERENDEN FLUGZEUGS | [2006/33] | English: | METHOD FOR MONITORING THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE FLIGHT PLAN OF A CO-OPERATING AIRCRAFT | [2006/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE SUIVI DU DEROULEMENT DU PLAN DE VOL D'UN AERONEF COOPERATIF | [2011/45] |
Former [2006/33] | PROCEDE DE SUIVI DU DEROULEMENT DU PLAN DE VOL D UN AERONEF COOPERATIF | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 18.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 29.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5548515 (PILLEY HAROLD R [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column A; claim - *; | [A]FR2803655 (THOMSON CSF SEXTANT [FR]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0396070 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9728423 (SEXTANT AVIONIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5548515 | FR2803655 |