Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007511944 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004FI50160 | 11.11.2004 | FI20031657 | 14.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1683343 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004FI50160 | 11.11.2004 | FI20031657 | 14.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1902905B | 06.04.2011 | B | CN1902905 | 24.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004FI50160 | 11.11.2004 | FI20031657 | 14.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005048584 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI20031657 | 14.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005151852 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI20031657 | 14.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100823121B | Global Dossier | 21.04.2008 | B1 | KR20060109487 | 20.10.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | FI20031657 | 14.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010183609 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | FI20031657 | 14.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI20031657 | 15.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | FI20031657 | 14.11.2003 |