EP1684866 - MEDICAL DEVICE FOR TREATING PROSTATE DISEASES BY USING NEAR-INFRARED LED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kim, Jin-il 2282-2, Daehwa-dong Ilsan-gu Goyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 411-806 / KR | [2006/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Marshall, John Grahame Serjeants 25 The Crescent, King Street Leicester LE1 6RX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Marshall, John Grahame Serjeants 25 The Crescent, King Street Leicester LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 04818571.4 | 10.11.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004KR02907 | Priority number, date | KR20030080780 | 14.11.2003 Original published format: KR 2003080780 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005046792 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1684866 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06, A61N5/08, A61N5/02, A61N5/04, A61B10/00 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
A61N5/0601 (EP,US);
A61N5/06 (KR);
A61H21/00 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00274 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00547 (EP,US);
A61H2201/10 (EP,US);
A61H23/02 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0608 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0652 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0659 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINPRODUKT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PROSTATERKRANKUNGEN MIT NAH-INFRAROT-LED | [2006/31] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE FOR TREATING PROSTATE DISEASES BY USING NEAR-INFRARED LED | [2006/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEDICAL PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LES AFFECTIONS DE LA PROSTATE AU MOYEN DE DEL A INFRAROUGE PROCHE | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/07] | 17.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5404881 (CATHAUD MURIEL [FR], et al); | [Y]KR20000031549 (CHO DAE JIN [KR]); | [Y]US5234004 (HASCOET GERARD [FR], et al); | [A]KR200170727Y (CHO DAE JIN [KR]); | [A]KR200326016Y ; | [A]KR200325750Y |