EP1684937 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A LOCKING SLEEVE, PARTICULARLY FOR A MANUAL TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FSG Automotive AG Badstrasse 2 09376 Oelsnitz / DE | [2006/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRSCHDORF, Dieter Im Päsken 26 46282 Dorsten / DE | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Linnemann, Winfried, et al Schulze Horn & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Voßgasse 3 48143 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Linnemann, Winfried, et al Schulze Horn & Partner GbR, Postfach 20 20 05 48101 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 04818762.9 | 09.11.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004EP12643 | Priority number, date | DE2003154167 | 19.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10354167 | DE20041020136 | 24.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004020136 | [2006/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005049264 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1684937 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1684937 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/00, F16H61/24, F16H63/38, B21D53/00 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
B21D53/00 (EP);
B23K26/38 (EP);
B23P15/00 (EP);
F16H63/38 (EP);
B23K2101/006 (EP);
B23K2101/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER RASTIERUNGSHÜLSE, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN SCHALTGETRIEBE | [2007/22] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A LOCKING SLEEVE, PARTICULARLY FOR A MANUAL TRANSMISSION | [2006/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MANCHON DE VERROUILLAGE, EN PARTICULIER POUR UNE BOÎTE DE VITESSES | [2007/22] |
Former [2006/31] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER RASTIERUNGSH LSE, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN SCHALTGETRIEBE | ||
Former [2006/31] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN MANCHON DE VERROUILLAGE, EN PARTICULIER POUR UNE BOITE DE VITESSES | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 21.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.02.2008 | CZ | 13.02.2008 | DK | 13.02.2008 | EE | 13.02.2008 | FI | 13.02.2008 | IE | 13.02.2008 | IT | 13.02.2008 | NL | 13.02.2008 | PL | 13.02.2008 | RO | 13.02.2008 | SI | 13.02.2008 | SK | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | BG | 13.05.2008 | SE | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | ES | 24.05.2008 | IS | 13.06.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | HU | 14.08.2008 | AT | 09.11.2008 | GB | 09.11.2008 | LU | 09.11.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
AT | 09.11.2008 | ||
GB | 09.11.2008 | ||
LU | 09.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
AT | 09.11.2008 | ||
GB | 09.11.2008 | ||
LU | 09.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
AT | 09.11.2008 | ||
GB | 09.11.2008 | ||
LU | 09.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
AT | 09.11.2008 | ||
GB | 09.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
GB | 09.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9603684 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 23; figure -; claims 1,5-7 *; | [A]EP0974777 (KOCHENDOERFER & KIEP METALLVER [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0017] , [0018]; figure - *; | [A]EP0985857 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 20 - line 42; figure 1 *; | [A]DE10029620 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1* column 8, line 5 - line 54; figures 1-3 * |