EP1687464 - SPINNING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Landgrafenstrasse 45 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2007/30] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Saurer GmbH & Co. KG Landgrafenstrasse 45 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUST, Jürgen Milsper Strasse 120a 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rössler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04819207.4 | 19.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004EP13169 | Priority number, date | DE2003155542 | 27.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10355542 | [2006/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005052224 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1687464 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1687464 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D01D4/06, D01D5/088, D01D13/00 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
D01D5/088 (EP,KR);
D01D4/00 (KR);
D01D13/00 (EP,KR);
D01D4/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI, TR [2006/46] |
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPINNANLAGE | [2006/32] | English: | SPINNING SYSTEM | [2006/32] | French: | METIER A FILER | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 24.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9617116 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0363317 (FILTECO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3343714 (SNAM PROGETTI [IT]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |