EP1693399 - POLYROTAXANE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-Ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-Ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Kohzo 21-2-708, Arakawa 3-chome, Arakawa-ku, Tokyo 1160002 / JP | 02 /
ARAKI, Jun Room 110, Grace-matsumi, 4-39-9, Minaminagasaki Toshima-ku, Tokyo 1710052 / JP | 03 /
ZHAO, Changming Room 304, Kureins-terrace, 5-26-10, Sendagi Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo 1130022 / JP | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte, Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04819364.3 | 24.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004JP17402 | Priority number, date | JP20030398774 | 28.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003398774 | [2006/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005052026 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1693399 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1693399 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00, C08G65/332, C08L71/02 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
C08G65/332 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/18 (KR);
C08B37/0015 (EP,US);
C08G65/00 (KR);
C08G83/007 (EP,US);
C08L5/16 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L5/16, C08L2666/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | C08G65/332, C08L71/02, C08B37/16, A61L27/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYROTAXAN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2006/34] | English: | POLYROTAXANE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2006/34] | French: | POLYROTAXANE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2006 | Translation filed | 23.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 31.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.11.2010 | BE | 10.11.2010 | CY | 10.11.2010 | CZ | 10.11.2010 | DK | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | FI | 10.11.2010 | IT | 10.11.2010 | NL | 10.11.2010 | PL | 10.11.2010 | RO | 10.11.2010 | SE | 10.11.2010 | SI | 10.11.2010 | SK | 10.11.2010 | TR | 10.11.2010 | IE | 24.11.2010 | LU | 24.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | BG | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | ES | 21.02.2011 | IS | 10.03.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | HU | 11.05.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LU | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
HU | 11.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
HU | 11.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 10.11.2010 | |
IS | 10.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5256819 (FRIED HERBERT E [US]) [X] 3,6,8* example -; claim - *; | [A]US6113880 (PLATZEK JOHANNES [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * example 3 *; | [DX]EP1283218 (CT FOR ADVANCED SCIENCE & TECH [JP]) [DX] 1,2,4,5,7 * paragraphs [0034] - [0042]; example 1; claims 1,12,13 *; | [A] - WATANABE J ET AL, "Feasibility study of hydrolyzable polyrotaxanes aiming at implantable materials", JOURNAL OF ARTIFICIAL ORGANS, SPRINGER VERLAG, TOKYO, JP, (2000), vol. 3, ISSN 1434-7229, pages 136 - 142, XP002969568 [A] 1-8 * page 138; figure 1 * * page 1281, lines 10-29 * | International search | [X]JPH08504794 ; | [A]JPH09301893 (KAGAKU GIJUTSU SHINKO JIGYODAN); | [A]JPH10306104 (HOKURIKU SENTAN KAGAKU GIJUTSU); | [A]JPH11319069 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP); | [X]WO0183566 (CT FOR ADVANCED SCIENCE & TECH [JP], et al) | by applicant | US5256819 | WO0183566 | - P. BULPITT; D. AESCHLIMANN, J. BIOMED. MATER. RES., (1999), vol. 47, pages 152 - 169 | - H. FUJITA; T. OOYA; N. YUI, MACROMOLECULES, (1999), vol. 32, pages 2534 - 2541 | - A.E.J. DE NOOY; A. C. BESEMER, TETRAHEDRON, (1995), vol. 51, no. 29, pages 8023 - 8032 |