EP1702081 - NICKEL-BASED SOLDER ALLOY, DEVOID OF TUNGSTEN, COMPRISING SPECIFIC RATIOS OF BORON, YTTRIUM AND PALLADIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines GmbH Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOPPE, Barbara Lange Strasse 44 59555 Lippstadt / DE | 02 /
MUKHERJI, Debashis Mittelweg 87 38106 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
RÖSLER, Joachim Lammer Heide 161 38116 Braunschweig / DE | 04 /
VOSSBERG, Andreas Kircher Vorfeld 30 30916 Isernhagen / DE | [2008/01] |
Former [2006/47] | 01 /
HOPPE, Barbara Lange Strasse 44 59555 Lippstadt / DE | ||
02 /
MUKHERJI, Debashis Viktoria Strasse 29 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | |||
03 /
RÖSLER, Joachim Lammer Heide 161 38116 Braunschweig / DE | |||
04 /
VOSSBERG, Andreas Kircher Vorfeld 30 30916 Isernhagen / DE | |||
Former [2006/46] | 01 /
HOPPE, Barbara Lange Strasse 44 59555 Lippstadt / DE | ||
02 /
MUKHERJI, Debashis Viktoria Strasse 29 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | |||
03 /
RÖSLER, Joachim Lammer Heide 161 38116 Braunschweig / DE | |||
04 /
VOSSBERG, Andreas Thieshof 8 30659 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [2006/38] | 01 /
HOPPE, Barbara Kasernenstrasse 44 38102 Braunschweig / DE | ||
02 /
MUKHERJI, Debashis Viktoria Strasse 29 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | |||
03 /
RÖSLER, Joachim Lammer Heide 161 38116 Braunschweig / DE | |||
04 /
VOSSBERG, Andreas Thieshof 8 30659 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 04819576.2 | 13.11.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004DE02516 | Priority number, date | DE2003156562 | 04.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10356562 | [2006/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005054528 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1702081 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1702081 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/05 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
C22C19/03 (EP,US);
B23K35/304 (EP,US);
C22C19/056 (EP,US);
C22C19/057 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WOLFRAMFREIE LOTLEGIERUNG AUF NICKELBASIS MIT EINEM SPEZIELLEN VERHÄLTNIS AUS BOR, YTTRIUM UND PALADIUM | [2007/31] | English: | NICKEL-BASED SOLDER ALLOY, DEVOID OF TUNGSTEN, COMPRISING SPECIFIC RATIOS OF BORON, YTTRIUM AND PALLADIUM | [2006/38] | French: | ALLIAGE DE BRASAGE SANS TUNGSTENE A BASE DE NICKEL, COMPORTANT UNE TENEUR PARTICULIERE EN BORE, YTTRIUM ET PALLADIUM | [2006/38] |
Former [2006/38] | WOLFRAMFREIE LOTLEGIERUNG AUF NICKELBASIS MIT EINEM SPEZIELLEN VERH LTNIS AUS BOR, YTTRIUM UND PALADIUM | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 24.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.02.2008 | CZ | 27.02.2008 | DK | 27.02.2008 | EE | 27.02.2008 | FI | 27.02.2008 | IE | 27.02.2008 | IT | 27.02.2008 | NL | 27.02.2008 | PL | 27.02.2008 | RO | 27.02.2008 | SI | 27.02.2008 | SK | 27.02.2008 | TR | 27.02.2008 | BG | 27.05.2008 | SE | 27.05.2008 | GR | 28.05.2008 | ES | 07.06.2008 | IS | 27.06.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | HU | 28.08.2008 | AT | 13.11.2008 | LU | 13.11.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
TR | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
AT | 13.11.2008 | ||
LU | 13.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
AT | 13.11.2008 | ||
LU | 13.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
AT | 13.11.2008 | ||
LU | 13.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
AT | 13.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4288247 (SHAW STUART W) [X] 1-8 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [X]GB2153845 (INCO ALLOYS PRODUCTS LIMITED) [X] 1* table 2 *; | [DX]US4830934 (FERRIGNO STEPHEN J [US], et al) [DX] 1,3-5,8 * abstract *; | [XDY]US5240491 (BUDINGER DAVID E [US], et al) [XD] 1-8,11-13,16-20 * claims 1-3 * * Tabelle 1, Leg. HMA-01 Tabelle 2, Leg. ADB-101 * * column 7, line 25 - line 47 * * Tabelle 1, Leg. LM8, LM9, LM10 * [Y] 15,21-23; | [Y]EP1226896 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0015] *; | [XY]US2002157737 (CHESNES RICHARD PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,11,16-19 * column 1, line 14 * * Tabelle 1, Legierung 20 * * claim 7 * * columns 52-58 * [Y] 21-23 |