EP1686879 - MOBILE OR PORTABLE APPARATUS WITH PRESSURIZED GAS SUPPLY FOR PREPARING BEVERAGES OR SIMILAR PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2007/42] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states NESTEC S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DWORZAK, Christoph Freiburgstrasse 30 CH-2503 Biel / CH | 02 /
MOCK, Elmar Rue Haute 23 CH-2013 Colombier / CH | 03 /
KLOPFENSTEIN, André Chemin de Rondans 37a CH-2520 La Neuveville / CH | 04 /
RUSCH, Christoph Alpenstrasse 59 Ch-2502 Biel / CH | 05 /
BITMEAD, Naomi Brüggbühlstrasse 101 Ch3172 Niderwangen b. / CH | 06 /
YOAKIM, Alfred Ch. de la Routiaz 2 CH-1806 St-Legier La Chiesaz / CH | 07 /
OZANNE, Matthieu Au Jordil CH-1846 Chessel / CH | [2006/39] |
Former [2006/32] | 01 /
DWORZAK, Christoph Molzgasse 10 CH-2502 Biel / CH | ||
02 /
MOCK, Elmar Rue Haute 23 CH-2013 Colombier / CH | |||
03 /
KLOPFENSTEIN, André Chemin de Rondans 37a CH-2520 La Neuveville / CH | |||
04 /
RUSCH, Christoph Alpenstrasse 59 Ch-2502 Biel / CH | |||
05 /
BITMEAD, Naomi Brüggbühlstrasse 101 Ch3172 Niderwangen b. / CH | |||
06 /
YOAKIM, Alfred Ch. de la Routiaz 2 CH-1806 St-Legier La Chiesaz / CH | |||
07 /
OZANNE, Matthieu Route du Simplon 31 CH-1094 Paudex / CH | Representative(s) | Schnyder, Frank Simon, et al Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/43] | Ducreux, Marie, et al Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2006/32] | Borne, Patrice Daniel IP Dept., Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 04819597.8 | 18.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004EP13093 | Priority number, date | EP20030026792 | 22.11.2003 Original published format: EP 03026792 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005053489 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1686879 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1686879 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40, A47J31/32 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
A47J31/402 (EP,US);
A47J31/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILE ODER TRAGBARE VORRICHTUNG MIT DRUCKGASRESERVOIR ZUR ZUBEREITUNG VON GETRÄNKEN ODER ÄHNLICHEN PRODUKTEN | [2006/32] | English: | MOBILE OR PORTABLE APPARATUS WITH PRESSURIZED GAS SUPPLY FOR PREPARING BEVERAGES OR SIMILAR PRODUCTS | [2006/32] | French: | APPAREIL MOBILE OU PORTATIF DOTE D'UNE ALIMENTATION EN GAZ SOUS PRESSION POUR PREPARER DES BOISSONS OU DES PRODUITS SIMILAIRES | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.10.2007 | CZ | 17.10.2007 | EE | 17.10.2007 | RO | 17.10.2007 | SI | 17.10.2007 | SK | 17.10.2007 | TR | 17.10.2007 | LU | 18.11.2007 | IE | 19.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | BG | 17.01.2008 | IS | 17.02.2008 | PT | 17.03.2008 | HU | 18.04.2008 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 17.10.2007 | |
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
LU | 18.11.2007 | ||
IE | 19.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
HU | 18.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CY | 17.10.2007 | |
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
IE | 19.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 17.10.2007 | |
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
IE | 19.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 17.10.2007 | |
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
IE | 19.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 17.10.2007 | |
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CZ | 17.10.2007 | |
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | SI | 17.10.2007 | |
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 17.10.2007 | |
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | BG | 17.01.2008 | |
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO8706812 (SANKEY VENDING LTD [GB]) [Y] 4,12 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 11; figure 1 *; | [YD]WO9902081 (GSCHWEND PETER [CH]) [YD] 1-7,10,12-22 * line 7 - page 9, line 17 * * abstract *; | [Y]US6082247 (BEAULIEU RODERICK H [US], et al) [Y] 3,5,10,13,23-25 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6123010 (BLACKSTONE MICHAEL ALEXANDER [US]) [Y] 18-20,22* column 1, lines 29-49 *; | [YD]WO02080743 (KEURIG INC [US]) [YD] 1-7,10,12-25 * page 2, line 30 - page 4, line 7; figures 1,2; claim 17 * |