EP1689427 - BIOMARKERS FOR THE EFFICACY OF CALCITONIN AND PARATHYROID HORMONE TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2006/33] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOBADILLA, Maria 25, rue du Loup 68220 Hésingue / FR | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Crawley, Patrick Edward Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | Crawley, Patrick Edward Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 04819617.4 | 24.11.2004 | [2006/33] | WO2004EP13347 | Priority number, date | US20030525025P | 25.11.2003 Original published format: US 525025 P | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005053731 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1689427 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/23, A61K38/29, A61P19/10 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
A61K38/23 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/29 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/33] | A61K38/23, A61K38/29, A61P19/08, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOMARKER FÜR DIE WIRKSAMKEIT VON CALCITONIN UND PARATHORMON-BEHANLDUNG | [2006/33] | English: | BIOMARKERS FOR THE EFFICACY OF CALCITONIN AND PARATHYROID HORMONE TREATMENT | [2006/33] | French: | BIOMARQUEURS POUR L'EFFICACITE D'UN TRAITEMENT A LA CALCITONINE OU A LA PARATHORMONE | [2006/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/51] | 01.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8700750 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 4-30 * abstract *; | [X]US5514365 (MARDENTE SALVATORE [IT], et al) [X] 4-7,12-30 * claims 1,4 *; | [X]WO0224943 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 39-48 * page 1, line 5 - line 6 * * page 68, line 10 - line 20 * * claims 1,7,9,15,21,24,29,35 *; | [A]WO02092854 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 4-49 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03038123 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 31,32 * page 18, paragraph L - page 19, paragraph F * * claim 43 *; | [A]US2003134776 (HAKONARSON HAKON [IS]) [A] 4-49 * abstract *; | [X] - FUJITA T, "PARATHYROID HORMONE IN THE TREATMENT OF OSTEOPOROSIS", BIODRUGS, AUCKLAND, NZ, (2001), vol. 15, no. 11, ISSN 1173-8804, pages 721 - 728, XP008012814 [X] 8-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00063030-200115110-00003 | [A] - HOCKETT R D ET AL, "Perspective: Pharmacogenomics in endocrinology", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM 2002 UNITED STATES, (2002), vol. 87, no. 6, ISSN 0021-972X, pages 2495 - 2499, XP002416933 [A] 4-49 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.87.6.2495 | [A] - QIN L ET AL, "Gene expression profiles and transcription factors involved in parathyroid hormone signaling in osteoblasts revealed by microarray and bioinformatics", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 30 MAY 2003 UNITED STATES, (20030530), vol. 278, no. 22, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 19723 - 19731, XP002416934 [A] 4-49 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M212226200 | International search | [X]JPS59175437 ; | [X]EP0385712 (TOYO JOZO KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * claims 1,4 *; | [X]US5514365 (MARDENTE SALVATORE [IT], et al) [X] 1-3* claims 1,4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850209), vol. 009, no. 032, Database accession no. (C - 265), & JP59175437 A 19841004 (TEIKOKU ZOKI SEIYAKU KK; others: 01) [X] 1-3 * abstract * |