EP1695158 - INTRINSICALLY SAFE DATA TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cooper Crouse-Hinds GmbH Senator-Schwartz-Ring 26 59494 Soest / DE | [2008/39] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states Cooper Industries, Inc. Texas Commerce Tower, 600 Travis, Suite 5800, P.O. Box 4446 Houston, TX 77002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Udo Aldenraderstrasse 13f 47169 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
SCHARFENBERG, Manfred Hallohweg 81 59425 Unna / DE | [2006/43] |
Former [2006/35] | 01 /
BECKER, Udo Luxemburger Allee 59 45481 Mülheim / DE | ||
02 /
SCHARFENBERG, Manfred Hallohweg 81 59425 Unna / DE | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04819652.1 | 03.12.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004EP13778 | Priority number, date | DE20031056985 | 05.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10356985 | [2006/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005054966 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1695158 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1695158 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, H02H9/00 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
H02H9/008 (EP,NO,US);
G05B2219/24028 (EP,NO,US);
G05B2219/31121 (EP,NO,US);
G05B2219/31135 (EP,NO,US);
G05B2219/34481 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIGENSICHERE DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2006/35] | English: | INTRINSICALLY SAFE DATA TRANSMISSION DEVICE | [2006/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES A SECURITE INTRINSEQUE | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.11.2010
01.12.2010
ADMISSIBLE R. Stahl Schaltgeräte GmbH Am Bahnhof 30 74638 Waldenburg / DE Opponent's representative Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.11.2010
01.12.2010
ADMISSIBLE R. Stahl Schaltgeräte GmbH Am Bahnhof 30 74638 Waldenburg / DE Opponent's representative Rüger Abel Patentanwälte Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | ||
Former [2011/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.11.2010
01.12.2010
ADMISSIBLE R. Stahl Schaltgeräte GmbH Am Bahnhof 30 74638 Waldenburg / DE Opponent's representative Jakubczyk, Adam Rafael Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.11.2010
R. Stahl Schaltgeräte GmbH Am Bahnhof 30 74638 Waldenburg / DE Opponent's representative Rüger, Rudolf Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. R. Rüger Dipl.-Ing. H.P. Barthelt Webergasse 3 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | 30.12.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.05.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.05.2011 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2011 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 08.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 20.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.04.2020 | 01.04.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2020 | 09.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.10.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/23] | 14.01.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 10.02.2014 | Appeal received No. T0327/14 | 08.04.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.04.2018 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M01) [2018/18] | 05.06.2018 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2018/23] | 27.11.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 27.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.2018 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.02.2010 | TR | 24.02.2010 | BG | 24.05.2010 | IS | 24.06.2010 | LU | 03.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | CY | 03.12.2011 | LT | 03.12.2011 | EE | 31.12.2011 | GR | 04.07.2012 | AT | 03.12.2016 | CZ | 03.12.2016 | IE | 03.12.2016 | PL | 03.12.2016 | SK | 03.12.2016 | ES | 04.12.2016 | HU | 04.12.2016 | SE | 04.12.2016 | SI | 04.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | DK | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | PT | 05.06.2017 | FI | 03.12.2017 | RO | 03.12.2017 | IT | 03.12.2019 | FR | 31.12.2019 | [2021/35] |
Former [2020/48] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
TR | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
LU | 03.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
CY | 03.12.2011 | ||
LT | 03.12.2011 | ||
EE | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
AT | 03.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
PL | 03.12.2016 | ||
SK | 03.12.2016 | ||
ES | 04.12.2016 | ||
HU | 04.12.2016 | ||
SE | 04.12.2016 | ||
SI | 04.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
DK | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.06.2017 | ||
FI | 03.12.2017 | ||
RO | 03.12.2017 | ||
IT | 03.12.2019 | ||
Former [2018/42] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
TR | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
LU | 03.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
CY | 03.12.2011 | ||
LT | 03.12.2011 | ||
EE | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
AT | 03.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
PL | 03.12.2016 | ||
SK | 03.12.2016 | ||
ES | 04.12.2016 | ||
HU | 04.12.2016 | ||
SE | 04.12.2016 | ||
SI | 04.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
DK | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.06.2017 | ||
FI | 03.12.2017 | ||
RO | 03.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
TR | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
LU | 03.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
CY | 03.12.2011 | ||
LT | 03.12.2011 | ||
EE | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
AT | 03.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
PL | 03.12.2016 | ||
SK | 03.12.2016 | ||
ES | 04.12.2016 | ||
HU | 04.12.2016 | ||
SE | 04.12.2016 | ||
SI | 04.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
DK | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.06.2017 | ||
FI | 03.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
TR | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
LU | 03.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
CY | 03.12.2011 | ||
LT | 03.12.2011 | ||
EE | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
AT | 03.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
PL | 03.12.2016 | ||
SK | 03.12.2016 | ||
ES | 04.12.2016 | ||
HU | 04.12.2016 | ||
SE | 04.12.2016 | ||
SI | 04.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
DK | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
TR | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
LU | 03.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
CY | 03.12.2011 | ||
LT | 03.12.2011 | ||
EE | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
AT | 03.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
PL | 03.12.2016 | ||
SK | 03.12.2016 | ||
HU | 04.12.2016 | ||
SE | 04.12.2016 | ||
SI | 04.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
DK | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
TR | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
LU | 03.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
CY | 03.12.2011 | ||
LT | 03.12.2011 | ||
EE | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
AT | 03.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
SK | 03.12.2016 | ||
HU | 04.12.2016 | ||
SE | 04.12.2016 | ||
SI | 04.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
DK | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
TR | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
LU | 03.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
CY | 03.12.2011 | ||
LT | 03.12.2011 | ||
EE | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
AT | 03.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
SK | 03.12.2016 | ||
HU | 04.12.2016 | ||
SE | 04.12.2016 | ||
SI | 04.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
TR | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
LU | 03.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
CY | 03.12.2011 | ||
LT | 03.12.2011 | ||
EE | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
AT | 03.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
SK | 03.12.2016 | ||
SE | 04.12.2016 | ||
SI | 04.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
TR | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
LU | 03.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
CY | 03.12.2011 | ||
LT | 03.12.2011 | ||
EE | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2016 | ||
SE | 04.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
TR | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
LU | 03.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
CY | 03.12.2011 | ||
LT | 03.12.2011 | ||
EE | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2015/21] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
TR | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
LU | 03.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
CY | 03.12.2011 | ||
LT | 03.12.2011 | ||
EE | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2011/36] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 24.02.2010 | |
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | IS | 24.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9631815 (CEAG SICHERHEITSTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]DE19910409 (HARTMANN & BRAUN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]EP1202139 (FOXBORO CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]US2002097031 (COOK WARREN E [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0056] - [0074] *; | [X] - JOHANNSMEYER U, "Fieldbus for process automation in hazardous locations-actual developments", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON EXPLOSION SAFETY IN HAZARDOUS AREAS (CONF. PUBL. NO.469), LONDON, UK, (1999), ISBN 0-85295-723-3, pages 61 - 67, XP002317460 [X] 1-16 * page 65; figures 5,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/cp:19991069 | [A] - Explosionsschutz, KARLSRUHE, SIEMENS AG, AUTOMATION AND DRIVES, PROCESS INSTRUMENTATION AND ANALYTICS, (200310), XP002317461 [A] 1-16 * Im Internet gefunden: https://pia.khe.siemens.com/efiles/ feldg/files/broschueren/Explosionprotection_ge.pdf Siemens-Bestellnr: A5E00265041; page 33 - page 34 * |