EP1716607 - ALKALINE CELL WITH FLAT HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, MA 02199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston Massachusetts 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANGLIN, David 16 Laurel Drive Brookfiled, CT 06804 / US | 02 /
ASHBOLT, Mark 13 Overlook Drive Newtown, CT 06470 / US | 03 /
BOBOWICK, Derek 116 Underhill Road Sandy Hook, CT 06482 / US | 04 /
FERRIN, Robert, S. 1 Grove Place Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 05 /
MALGIOGLIO, Anthony 100 Hope Street, No. 21 Stamford, CT 06906 / US | 06 /
MERRILL, Brien 2 Pine Acres Drive New Fairfield, CT 06812 / US | 07 /
SHELEKHIN, Alexander 4 High Valley Road Ridgefield, CT 06812 / US | 08 /
SPECHT, STeven, J. 18 Cove Street Brookfield, CT 06804 / US | 09 /
SYLVESTRE, Matthew 7 Crane Road Woodbury, CT 06798 / US | 10 /
TRAINER, Philip 9 WInesap Road Sandy Hook, CT 06482 / US | 11 /
YOPPOLO, Robert, A. 6 Fairoak Circle New Milford, CT 06776 / US | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/44] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauer Strasse 37 D-80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04820021.6 | 12.11.2004 | [2006/44] | WO2004US37979 | Priority number, date | US20030722879 | 26.11.2003 Original published format: US 722879 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005055342 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1716607 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/12 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALKALIZELLE MIT FLACHGEHÄUSE | [2006/44] | English: | ALKALINE CELL WITH FLAT HOUSING | [2006/44] | French: | PILE ALCALINE DOTEE D'UN BOITIER PLAT | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 11.02.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS59154742 ; | [Y]JPH1092397 ; | [Y]JPH11185714 ; | [X]EP1258931 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7 * claims 1-17 * * figure 1 *; | [PX]US2004131922 (ANGLIN DAVID [US], et al) [PX] 1-52 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2004131929 (ANGLIN DAVID [US], et al) [PX] 1-52 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2004131942 (ANGLIN DAVID [US], et al) [PX] 13-52 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2004131923 (ANGLIN DAVID [US], et al) [PX] 1-52 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2004131931 (ANGLIN DAVID [US], et al) [PX] 13-52 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850110), vol. 009, no. 004, Database accession no. (E - 288), & JP59154742 A 19840903 (HITACHI MAXELL KK) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10092397 A 19980410 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11185714 A 19990709 (AT BATTERY:KK; TOSHIBA ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING CORP) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * |