EP1693886 - SUBSTRATE TREATMENT DEVICE CONTROL METHOD AND SUBSTRATE TREATMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINOZUKA, S. Tokyo Elec.Kyushu Limited Koshi Plant 1-1, Fukuhara, Koshi-machi Kikuchi-gun, Kumamoto 861-1116 / JP | 02 /
WADA, S. Tokyo Electron Kyushu Limited Koshi Plant 1-1, Fukuhara, Koshi-machi Kikuchi-gun, Kumamoto 861-1116 / JP | 03 /
YAMASHITA, Masami 2655, Tsukure Kikuyo-machi, Kikuchi-gun Kumamoto 869-1197 / JP | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04820143.8 | 30.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004JP17752 | Priority number, date | JP20030410105 | 09.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003410105 | [2006/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005057633 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1693886 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/027, G03F7/16, H01L21/00, H01L21/68 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
H01L21/67745 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67276 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/162 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/3021 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67253 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | H01L21/027, G03F7/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/12] |
Former [2006/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTRATBEHANDLUNGS-EINRICHTUNGSSTEUERVERFAHREN UND SUBSTRATBEHANDLUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2006/34] | English: | SUBSTRATE TREATMENT DEVICE CONTROL METHOD AND SUBSTRATE TREATMENT DEVICE | [2006/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2006 | Translation filed | 08.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 25.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 30.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002009658 (SATO NORIKATSU [JP], et al) [A] 1,8* the whole document *; | [YA]EP1300874 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP]) [Y] 4-6,11-14 * the whole document * [A] 1,8; | [XY]JP2003115426 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG) [X] 1-3,7-10,15,16 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] - [0034] , [0035] , [0042] - [0044] - [0100] * [Y] 4-6,11-14 | International search | [X]JP2003115426 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG); | [A]JP2003045776 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG); | [A]JP2003037043 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG); | [A]JPH10172902 (NIKON CORP) | by applicant | JP2000223401 | JP2003115426 |