EP1692480 - TENSION INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holmbergs Childsafety Holding AB Stationsgatan 30 302 45 Halmstad / SE | [2011/46] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states Kendrion Holmbergs AB P O Box 63 334 21 Anderstorp / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Peter 104 Glasgow Lane Noblesville, IN 46060 / US | 02 /
KARLSSON, Rojel Mogatan 6 S-330 27 Hestra / SE | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | VALEA AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Asketorp, Göran Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Asketorp, Göran Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 04820422.6 | 07.12.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004EP13908 | Priority number, date | SE20030003330 | 09.12.2003 Original published format: SE 0303330 | US20030529423P | 11.12.2003 Original published format: US 529423 P | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005059493 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692480 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692480 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/04, G01L5/06 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
G01L5/047 (EP);
B60R21/0155 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Title | German: | SPANNUNGSANZEIGER | [2006/34] | English: | TENSION INDICATOR | [2006/34] | French: | INDICATEUR DE TENSION | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 22.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2004 | AT | 07.03.2012 | BE | 07.03.2012 | CY | 07.03.2012 | CZ | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | LT | 07.03.2012 | PL | 07.03.2012 | RO | 07.03.2012 | SI | 07.03.2012 | SK | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | BG | 07.06.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | IS | 07.07.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | IE | 07.12.2012 | LU | 07.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 07.12.2012 | ||
LU | 07.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 07.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 07.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 07.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3839908 (CASPER W,US) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 34; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2; | [Y]US2001035122 (MARGETTS WAYNE) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0019] - [0024]; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]US6205868 (MILLER GREGORY S) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4846000 (STEINSEIFER ET AL) [A] 1 * column 2, line 8 - line 41; figure 1 * |