EP1697657 - CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohs, Ulrich Roonstrasse 11 52351 Düren / DE | [2014/14] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Rohs, Ulrich, Dr. Roonstrasse 11 52351 Düren / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROHS, Ulrich Roonstrasse 11 52351 Düren / DE | 02 /
DRÄGER, Christoph Viehövener Strasse 31 52459 Inden / DE | 03 /
BARTLING, Tim Achterstrasse 6 52062 Aachen / DE | 04 /
BRANDWITTE, Werner Der Fusshof 4 52379 Langerwehe / DE | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Reuther, Martin, et al Patentanwalt Zehnthofstrasse 9 52349 Düren / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Reuther, Martin, et al Patentanwalt Zehnthofstrasse 9 52349 Düren / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | Reuther, Martin Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell, Gutenbergstrasse 12 52349 Düren / DE | Application number, filing date | 04820575.1 | 02.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004DE02647 | Priority number, date | DE20031061542 | 23.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10361542 | CN20041031846 | 30.03.2004 Original published format: CN200410031846 | BR20040402959 | 16.07.2004 Original published format: BR 0402959 | [2006/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005061928 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1697657 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1697657 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16H15/42 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
F16H15/42 (EP,KR);
F16H15/04 (KR);
F16H61/66 (KR);
F16H61/662 (KR);
F16H61/66236 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Title | German: | STUFENLOS EINSTELLBARES GETRIEBE | [2006/36] | English: | CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION | [2006/36] | French: | TRANSMISSION A VARIATION CONTINUE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 29.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 30.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2004 | CY | 02.04.2014 | CZ | 02.04.2014 | DK | 02.04.2014 | EE | 02.04.2014 | FI | 02.04.2014 | LT | 02.04.2014 | MC | 02.04.2014 | NL | 02.04.2014 | PL | 02.04.2014 | RO | 02.04.2014 | SE | 02.04.2014 | SI | 02.04.2014 | SK | 02.04.2014 | TR | 02.04.2014 | BG | 02.07.2014 | GR | 03.07.2014 | IS | 02.08.2014 | PT | 04.08.2014 | AT | 02.12.2014 | IE | 02.12.2014 | LU | 02.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
AT | 02.12.2014 | ||
IE | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
AT | 02.12.2014 | ||
IE | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
IE | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
IE | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
LU | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
LU | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0878641 (ROHS ULRICH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 18-22; figures 1-4,6 * [A] 4-10; | [XA]US5924953 (ROHS ULRICH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 44-47; figures 1-4,6 * [A] 4-10; | [A]US4322798 (MCCOIN DAN K) [A] 4-10 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0003887 (BALES MCCOIN RESEARCH INC [US]) [A] 4-10 * figure 4 * | by applicant | GB298676 |