EP1695656 - TREATMENT TOOL PLUG FOR ENDOSCOPE AND PLUG BODY FOR TREATMENT TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAYA, Koji 2130-8, Nakanocho, Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1920015 / JP | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [2016/05] |
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04820633.8 | 04.11.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004JP16308 | Priority number, date | JP20030421277 | 18.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003421277 | JP20040038857 | 16.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004038857 | [2006/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005060822 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1695656 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1695656 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
A61B1/00137 (EP,US);
A61B1/012 (KR);
A61B1/00 (KR);
A61B1/018 (EP,US);
A61B17/3462 (EP,US);
A61M39/0606 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2016/05] |
Former [2007/13] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSWERKZEUG-PFROPF FÜR ENDOSKOP UND PFROPFKORPUS FÜR BEHANDLUNGSWERKZEUG | [2006/35] | English: | TREATMENT TOOL PLUG FOR ENDOSCOPE AND PLUG BODY FOR TREATMENT TOOL | [2006/35] | French: | BOUCHON D'INSTRUMENT DE TRAITEMENT POUR ENDOSCOPE ET CORPS DE BOUCHON POUR INSTRUMENT DE TRAITEMENT | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2006 | Translation filed | 14.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 25.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YX]US4715360 (AKUI NOBUAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-22 * column 1, lines 39-47 * * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 44; figures 1,2 *[X] 23,24; | [Y]US5104379 (NAKAMURA ICHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-22 * column 4, lines 38-64; figure 1 * * column 14, line 59 - column 15, line 64; figures 44-46 * * column 12, line 44 - column 13, line 21; figures 41-43 * | International search | [Y]JPH06189899 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]JP2001231748 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) | by applicant | JPS6189899 | US4715360 | JPH03101908U | US5104379 | JP2001231748 |