EP1698945 - RESIN-COATED CARRIER FOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPING AGENT, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPING AGENT UTILIZING THE RESIN-COATED CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Powdertech Co., Ltd. 217, Toyofuta Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-8557 / JP | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAYAMOTO, Kanao, c/o Powdertech Co, . Ltd. 217, Toyofuta, Kashiwa-Chi Chiba 2778557 / JP | 02 /
HOJO, Hironori, c/o Powdertech Co, . Ltd. 217, Toyofuta, Kashiwa-shi Chiba 2778557 / JP | 03 /
HONJO, Toshio, c/o Powdertech Co, . Ltd. 217, Toyofuta, Kashiwa-shi Chiba 2778557 / JP | [2012/43] |
Former [2006/36] | 01 /
KAYAMOTO, Kanao, c/o Powdertech Co, . Ltd. 217, Toyofuta, Kashiwa-Chi Chiba 2778557 / JP | ||
02 /
HOJO, Hironori, c/o Powdertech Co, . Ltd. 217, Toyofuta, Kashiwa-shi Chiba 2778557 / JP | |||
03 /
HONJO, Toshio, c/o Powdertech Co, . Ltd. 217, Toyofuta, Kashiwa-shi Chiba 2778557 / JP | Representative(s) | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 1 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Bohmann, Armin K. bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 1 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann & Loosen, Anwaltssozietät, Sonnenstrasse 8 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04820644.5 | 25.11.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004JP17452 | Priority number, date | JP20030424672 | 22.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003424672 | [2006/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005062132 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1698945 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1698945 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/107, G03G9/113 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
G03G9/113 (EP,US);
G03G9/1075 (EP,US);
G03G9/1085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/36] | G03G9/113 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Title | German: | HARZBESCHICHTETER TRÄGER FÜR EINEN ELEKTROFOTOGRAFISCHEN ENTWICKLUNGSAGENTEN, PROZESS ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAFÜR UND ELEKTROFOTOGRAFISCHER ENTWICKLUNGSAGENT MIT DEM HARZBESCHICHTETEN TRÄGER | [2006/36] | English: | RESIN-COATED CARRIER FOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPING AGENT, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPING AGENT UTILIZING THE RESIN-COATED CARRIER | [2006/36] | French: | SUPPORT A REVETEMENT DE RESINE POUR AGENT REVELATEUR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET AGENT REVELATEUR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE METTANT EN APPLICATION CE SUPPORT | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2006 | Translation filed | 09.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 22.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2004 | AT | 24.10.2012 | BE | 24.10.2012 | CY | 24.10.2012 | CZ | 24.10.2012 | DK | 24.10.2012 | EE | 24.10.2012 | FI | 24.10.2012 | IT | 24.10.2012 | NL | 24.10.2012 | PL | 24.10.2012 | RO | 24.10.2012 | SE | 24.10.2012 | SI | 24.10.2012 | SK | 24.10.2012 | TR | 24.10.2012 | IE | 25.11.2012 | LU | 25.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | FR | 26.12.2012 | BG | 24.01.2013 | GB | 24.01.2013 | GR | 25.01.2013 | ES | 04.02.2013 | IS | 24.02.2013 | PT | 25.02.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
LU | 25.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GB | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GB | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GB | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 24.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3914181 (BERG ALLEN CLARK, et al) [Y] 4-8 * abstract ** column 7, line 20 - column 8, line 24 *; | [XY]EP1349014 (POWDERTECH CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,9 * examples 1, 3 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * [Y] 4-8 | International search | [X]US2003186156 (KAYAMOTO KANAO [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2001027828 (RICOH KK, et al); | [Y]JP2002091092 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH08202084 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [Y]JPH07234548 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2003156887 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2000267443 (CANON KK) |