EP1712303 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COLLECTING BASE PAPER FOR GYPSUM PLASTER BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yoshino Gypsum Co., Ltd. Shintokyo Building, 3-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2006/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHI, Michio, @Tech.Dep., @YOSHINO GYPSUM CO., LTD. 1-1, Kohoku 2-Chome Adachi-Ku Tokyo 123-0872 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Takehiro, @Tech.Dep, @YOSHINO GYPSUM CO., LTD. 1-1, Kohoku 2-Chome Adachi-Ku Tokyo 123-0872 / JP | 03 /
TAIRA, Shizuo, @Tech.Dep, @YOSHINO GYPSUM CO., LTD. 1-1, Kohoku 2-Chome Adachi-Ku Tokyo 123-0872 / JP | [2016/31] |
Former [2006/49] | 01 /
NISHI, Michio, Tech.Dep., YOSHINO GYPSUM CO. LTD 1-1, Kohoku 2-Chome, Adachi-Ku Tokyo 123-0872 / JP | ||
02 /
TANAKA, Takehiro, Tech.Dep, YOSHINO GYPSUM CO. LTD 1-1, Kohoku 2-Chome, Adachi-Ku Tokyo 123-0872 / JP | |||
03 /
TAIRA, Shizuo, Tech.Dep, YOSHINO GYPSUM CO. LTD 1-1, Kohoku 2-Chome, Adachi-Ku Tokyo 123-0872 / JP | |||
Former [2006/42] | 01 /
NISHI, M., Technical Dep., YOSHINO GYPSUM CO. LTD 1-1, Kohoku 2-Chome, Adachi-Ku Tokyo 123-0872 / JP | ||
02 /
TANAKA, T., Technical Dep., YOSHINO GYPSUM CO. LTD 1-1, Kohoku 2-Chome, Adachi-Ku Tokyo 123-0872 / JP | |||
03 /
TAIRA, S., Technical Dep., YOSHINO GYPSUM CO. LTD 1-1, Kohoku 2-Chome, Adachi-Ku Tokyo 123-0872 / JP | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [2016/31] |
Former [2007/44] | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Cale Cross House Pilgrim Street Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | ||
Former [2006/42] | Rees, Alexander Ellison Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 04820672.6 | 06.12.2004 | [2006/42] | WO2004JP18148 | Priority number, date | JP20030424752 | 22.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003424752 | [2006/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061133 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1712303 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1712303 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B03B9/06, D21B1/02, B09B3/00 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
D21B1/026 (EP,US);
B09B3/00 (KR);
B03B9/065 (EP,US);
B09B5/00 (KR);
Y02W30/52 (EP,US);
Y02W30/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/42] | B09B3/00, B09B5/00, D21B1/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2006/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SAMMELN VON BASISPAPIER FÜR GIPSPLATTE | [2006/42] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COLLECTING BASE PAPER FOR GYPSUM PLASTER BOARD | [2006/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR COLLECTER DU PAPIER SUPPORT POUR UNE PLAQUE DE PLATRE | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2006 | Translation filed | 22.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2004 | CY | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | LT | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | NL | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | SE | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | TR | 03.08.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | IE | 06.12.2016 | LU | 06.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.12.2004 | |
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 06.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | DK | 03.08.2016 | |
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 06.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | DK | 03.08.2016 | |
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | DK | 03.08.2016 | |
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | DK | 03.08.2016 | |
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 03.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB209648 (AMERICAN REDUCTION CO) [A] 1,3,5-8,11 * page 1, line 15 - line 20 * * page 1, line 35 - line 41 * * page 1, line 79 - page 2, line 80 * * page 2, line 95 - line 102 * * page 3, line 16 - line 38 * * page 3, line 78 - line 95 ** figure - *; | [DY]JPH06142638 (YOSHINO GYPSUM CO) [DY] 1-3,5-9,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008] *; | [Y]WO9619613 (KNOWASTE TECH INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-9,11 * abstract * * page 1, line 33 - line 38 * * page 2, line 15 - line 19 * * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 11 * * page 9, line 7 - line 17 * * page 12, line 3 - line 7 * * page 12, line 25 - line 29 * * page 13, line 35 - page 14, line 2 * * page 14, line 11 - line 12 * * figure - * | International search | [Y]JPH06142638 (YOSHINO GYPSUM CO); | [Y]JPH08176985 (SAKAE KOKI KK); | [A]JPH10296224 (KENZAI TECHNO KENKYUSHO KK); | [Y]JPH11200269 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD); | [A]JPH11278891 (RISAIENSU LABO KK, et al) | by applicant | JPH06142638 | WO9619613 |