EP1699960 - PROCESS FOR REINFORCING A HYDRO-ENTANGLED PULP FIBRE MATERIAL, AND HYDRO-ENTANGLED PULP FIBRE MATERIAL REINFORCED BY THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRALIN, Anders Andalen 95 S-423 38 Torslanda / SE | 02 /
STRANDQVIST, Mikael Dälavägen 87 S-437 36 Lindome / SE | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 04820695.7 | 23.11.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004SE01705 | Priority number, date | SE20030003509 | 22.12.2003 Original published format: SE 0303509 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061772 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1699960 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/48, D06M15/263, D21H15/06, D21H25/02, // D21H19/58 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
D21H23/28 (EP);
D21H25/02 (EP);
D21H15/06 (EP);
D21H19/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG EINES WASSERSTRAHLVERWIRBELTEN PULPFASERMATERIALS UND SO VERSTÄRKTES WASSERSTRAHLVERWIRBELTES PULPFASERMATERIAL | [2006/37] | English: | PROCESS FOR REINFORCING A HYDRO-ENTANGLED PULP FIBRE MATERIAL, AND HYDRO-ENTANGLED PULP FIBRE MATERIAL REINFORCED BY THE PROCESS | [2006/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE RENFORCEMENT DE MATIERE FIBREUSE DE PATE A PAPIER HYDRO-ENCHEVETREE ET MATIERE FIBREUSE DE PATE A PAPIER HYDRO-ENCHEVETREE RENFORCEE PAR LE PROCEDE | [2006/37] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 03.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/47] | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0411752 ; | [Y]US5198293 ; | [A]EP0491383 ; | [A]US2003232553 ; | [A]US5292581 ; | [A]US6579391 ; | [A]US6349826 |