EP1692217 - VOID-CONTAINING POLYESTER SHRINK FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [2010/20] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELBY, Marcus, David 299 Pactolus Road Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | 02 /
HELTON, Tony, Wayne 424 Light Street Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | 03 /
SHARPE, Emerson, Eston, Jr. 1208 Mourning Dove Drive Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04820764.1 | 17.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004US38592 | Priority number, date | US20030526305P | 02.12.2003 Original published format: US 526305 P | US20040942339 | 16.09.2004 Original published format: US 942339 | US20040942719 | 16.09.2004 Original published format: US 942719 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061596 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692217 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692217 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08L67/02 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,KR);
C08L101/00 (EP,KR);
C08J5/00 (KR);
C08J5/18 (KR);
C08L67/04 (KR);
C08L77/00 (KR);
C08L81/06 (KR);
C08L2203/12 (KR);
C08L2203/16 (KR);
C08L2205/02 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L101/00, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOHLRAUMHALTIGE POLYESTERSCHRUMPFFOLIE | [2006/34] | English: | VOID-CONTAINING POLYESTER SHRINK FILM | [2006/34] | French: | FILM RETRECISSABLE DE POLYESTER CONTENANT DES VIDES | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.2010 | BE | 19.05.2010 | CY | 19.05.2010 | CZ | 19.05.2010 | DK | 19.05.2010 | EE | 19.05.2010 | FI | 19.05.2010 | NL | 19.05.2010 | RO | 19.05.2010 | SE | 19.05.2010 | SI | 19.05.2010 | SK | 19.05.2010 | TR | 19.05.2010 | BG | 19.08.2010 | GR | 20.08.2010 | ES | 30.08.2010 | IS | 19.09.2010 | PT | 20.09.2010 | IE | 17.11.2010 | LU | 17.11.2010 | HU | 20.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
TR | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LU | 17.11.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LU | 17.11.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | ES | 30.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4770931 (POLLOCK MARK A [US], et al) [DA] 1-34 * claim - *; | [A]EP0522758 (UNITIKA LTD [JP]) [A] 1-34 * claims 1,3,6 *; | [A]US5811493 (KENT SUSAN L [US]) [A] 1-34* claim 19 * |