EP1699424 - COSMETIC COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2007/17] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London, Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever Naamloze Vennootschap Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2006/37] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London, Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
Unilever Naamloze Vennootschap Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Liang B., Unilever Home & Personal Care USA 3100 East Golf Road, Rolling Meadows Chicago, IL 60008-4009 / US | 02 /
BREWSTER, D. A., Unilever Home & Personal Care USA 3100 East Golf Road, Rolling Meadows Chicago, IL 60008-4009 / US | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Pearce, Timothy, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Pearce, Timothy, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04820818.5 | 07.12.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004EP13958 | Priority number, date | US20030748945 | 29.12.2003 Original published format: US 748945 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005063187 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1699424 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/18, A45D34/00 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
A61K8/28 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/37] | English: | COSMETIC COMPOSITION | [2006/37] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMETIQUE | [2006/37] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2080678 (BRISTOL MYERS CO) [X] 1-44 * example 3; claim 1 *; | [X]US6416750 (HARPER THOMAS LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-24,43,44 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2839953 (SAUNIERE JEAN [FR], et al) [A] 25 * page 11, lines 20-29; figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]US6547471 (TUCKER WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 25 * the whole document * | [X] - MANUFACTURING CHEMIST, GB, (1994), vol. 65, no. 3, page 36, XP000431511 [X] 1-24,43,44 * the whole document * |