EP1660307 - WINDOW SKIN PANEL AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago IL 60606-2016 / US | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/29] | For all designated states The Boeing Company P.O. Box 3707 M.S. 11-XT Seattle, WA 98124-2207 / US | ||
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states The Boeing Company P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 11-XT Seattle Washington 98124-2207 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORDMAN, Paul, S. 13530 SE 173rd Place Renton, WA 98058 / US | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2010/27] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2010/24] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2006/22] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04821028.0 | 02.09.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US28552 | Priority number, date | US20030654765 | 04.09.2003 Original published format: US 654765 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005065920 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1660307 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1660307 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1660307 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/84, B29C70/74, B64C1/14, B32B15/14, B29C70/08, B32B17/02, B32B17/10, B29C70/88, // B29L31/30, B29L31/00 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
B29C70/745 (EP,US);
B29C70/088 (EP,US);
B29C70/84 (EP,US);
B29C70/885 (EP,US);
B32B17/02 (EP,US);
B32B17/10302 (EP,US);
B32B17/10853 (EP,US);
B64C1/1484 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3076 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/11] | B29C70/74, B29C70/84, B64C1/14, B32B15/14, B29C70/08 | ||
Former IPC [2006/22] | B29C70/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Title | German: | FENSTERBEPLANKUNGSBLECH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2006/22] | English: | WINDOW SKIN PANEL AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [2006/22] | French: | PANNEAU DE REVETEMENT A FENETRE ET PROCEDE POUR SA PRODUCTION | [2014/13] |
Former [2006/22] | PANNEAU DE REVETEMENT A FENETRE ET PROCEDE POUR SON PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 17.02.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 16.04.2010 | Appeal received No. T1413/10 | 16.06.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.07.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 11.07.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.07.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP10152319.9 / EP2221168 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2004 | AT | 16.07.2014 | BE | 16.07.2014 | CY | 16.07.2014 | CZ | 16.07.2014 | DK | 16.07.2014 | EE | 16.07.2014 | FI | 16.07.2014 | MC | 16.07.2014 | NL | 16.07.2014 | PL | 16.07.2014 | RO | 16.07.2014 | SE | 16.07.2014 | SI | 16.07.2014 | SK | 16.07.2014 | TR | 16.07.2014 | IE | 02.09.2014 | LU | 02.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | BG | 16.10.2014 | GR | 17.10.2014 | PT | 17.11.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.09.2004 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
SE | 16.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH1036139 ; | [A]US5039566 (SKUBIC RAYMOND J [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * claims 1,8 *; | [A]US5665450 (DAY DELBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * claims 11-17,25-27 *; | [A]WO0020275 (WILLIAMS INTERNATIONAL CO L L [US]) [A] 1-33 * page 4, line 24 - page 7, line 7; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6082674 (WHITE WALTER LEON [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * column 3, line 16 - line 56; figure 1 * * column 5, line 11 - line 20; figures 4a,4b *; | [A]US2003082341 (CHU CHIN FA [TW]) [A] 1-33* paragraph [0023]; figure 4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10036139 A 19980210 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-33 * abstract * |