EP1553814 - Electromagnetic wave shield case and a method for manufacturing electromagnetic wave shield case [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | For all designated states Inoue, Akihisa Kawauchi-Juutaku 11-806 Kawauchimotohasekura 35-banchi Aoba-ku Sendai-city Miyagi-ken 980-0861 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Inoue, Akihisa Kawauchi-Juutaku 11-806 Kawauchimotohasekura 35-banchi Aoba-ku Sendai-city Miyagi-ken 980-0861 / JP | |||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Inoue, Akihisa Kawauchi-Juutaku 11-806 Kawauchimotohasekura 35-banchi Aoba-ku Sendai-city, Miyagi-ken 980-0861 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muramatsu, Naokuni Intellectual Property Dept. NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Akihisa Kawauchi-Juutaku 11-806, Kawauchimotohasekura 35 B Aoba-ku Sendai-city Miyagi-ken 980-0861 / JP | 03 /
Zhang, Tao Beijinghangkonghangtiandaxue-Jiashulou 217-102 37, Xueyuanlu Beijing-city 100083 / CN | 04 /
Kimura, Hisamichi 44, Arahamafujihirabashi Watari-cho Watari-gun Miyagi-ken 989-2311 / JP | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/28] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05000119.7 | 05.01.2005 | [2005/28] | Priority number, date | JP20040002995 | 08.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004002995 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1553814 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553814 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
H05K9/0026 (EP,US);
H05K9/00 (KR);
H05K9/0069 (EP,US);
H01F1/15358 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [2006/14] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektromagnetisches Abschirmgehäuse und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2005/28] | English: | Electromagnetic wave shield case and a method for manufacturing electromagnetic wave shield case | [2005/28] | French: | Boîtier de blindage électromagnétique et son procédé de fabrication | [2005/28] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 22.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH1171656 ; | [A]JPH1112490 ; | [A]EP0092091 (ALLIED CORP [US]) [A] 10-12 * abstract *; | [A]WO0048440 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1063312 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2806019 (INST NAT POLYTECH GRENOBLE [FR]) [A] 10-12 * abstract *; | [A]WO0199483 (LAIRD TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [YA]WO02052916 (SHIELDING FOR ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [Y] 5-9 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,10-12; | [A]WO03013207 (ROSTI AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11071656 A 19990316 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD; INOUE AKIHISA) [Y] 5-9 * abstract * [A] 1-4,10-12 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11012490 A 19990119 (NITTETSU MINING CO LTD; NAKATSUKA KATSUTO) [A] 10-12 * abstract * |