EP1555489 - Garment for a personal air-conditioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entrak Energie- und Antriebstechnik GmbH & Co. Kg Richtweg 33 90530 Wendelstein / DE | [2005/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pohr, Sebastian Heinz Buchschwabacher Strasse 19 90574 Rosstal / DE | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Blaumeier, Jörg Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Blaumeier, Jörg Lindner, Blaumeier & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 119109 90101 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2005/29] | LINDNER BLAUMEIER & KOLLEGEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05000551.1 | 13.01.2005 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | DE20041002287 | 16.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004002287 | [2005/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1555489 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/29] | Classification | IPC: | F24F5/00 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
F24F5/00 (EP);
A41D13/0025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kleidungsstück zur Personenklimatisierung | [2005/29] | English: | Garment for a personal air-conditioning system | [2005/29] | French: | Vêtement pour un dispositif de climatisation individuelle | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |