EP1522544 - Process for the polymerization of olefins; polyethylenes, and films and articles produced therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTLAKE LONGVIEW CORPORATION 2801 Post Oak Boulevard Suite 600 Houston, TX 77056 / US | [2007/36] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states Eastman Chemical Company 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660-5075 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ford, Randal Ray 3013 Latonia Longview Texas 75605-1505 / US | 02 /
Stuart, Richard Kingsley Jr. c/o Eastman Chem.Comp 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, Tennessee 37660 / US | [2005/22] |
Former [2005/15] | 01 /
Ford, Randal Ray 3013 Latonia Longview Texas 75605-1505 / US | ||
02 /
Stuart, Richard Kingsley Jr. 719 Oakwood Drive Longview Texas 75604-3112 / US | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05000815.0 | 14.10.1999 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | US19980105786P | 27.10.1998 Original published format: US 105786 P | US19990386547 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: US 386547 | [2005/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1522544 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1522544 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1522544 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/18 (KR);
C08F2/34 (KR);
C08F4/602 (KR);
C08F4/6093 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6493 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/6494 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F2/005 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F2/40 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Polymerisierung von Olefine; Polyethylene, und Filme, und Gegenstände damit hergestellt | [2005/15] | English: | Process for the polymerization of olefins; polyethylenes, and films and articles produced therefrom | [2005/15] | French: | Technique de polymérisation d'olefines, polyéthylènes, films et articles produits à l'aide de ces polyéthylènes. | [2005/15] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99954979.3 / EP1047717 | Divisional application(s) | EP07008240.9 / EP1860127 | EP10010550.1 / EP2277922 | EP10010551.9 / EP2277923 | EP10010552.7 / EP2277924 | EP10010553.5 / EP2277925 | EP10010560.0 / EP2275455 | EP10010561.8 / EP2287211 | EP10010562.6 / EP2275456 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.2008 | BE | 12.03.2008 | CY | 12.03.2008 | DK | 12.03.2008 | FI | 12.03.2008 | IT | 12.03.2008 | NL | 12.03.2008 | SE | 12.06.2008 | GR | 13.06.2008 | ES | 23.06.2008 | PT | 18.08.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB942757 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) [X] 1-4,9-22,27-31,34-47 * examples 1-15; claims 1,2,5 *; | [X]US4211670 (VANDENBERG EDWIN J [US]) [X] 1-4,9,19-22,27,46,47* column 5, line 20 - column 5, line 60 *; | [X]EP0449519 (SHELL OIL CO [US]) [X] 1-4,7,9,17,19-22,25,27,35,36,46,47 * page 3, line 11 - page 3, line 38 *; | [X]US5296430 (FUNABASHI HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9,19-22,27,46,47 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0703246 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [DA] 1-4,9-22,27-31,34-47 * page 4, line 51 - page 4, line 53; claim 1 * |