EP1557201 - Improved active camming device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black Diamond Equipment AG Christoph Merian-Ring 7 4153 Reinach / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Black Diamond Equipment AG Christoph Merian Ring 7 4153 Reinach / CH | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Black Diamond Equipment AG Christoph Merian Ring 7 4153 Reinach / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tusting, Paul 3935 South 2000 East Salt Lake City, UT 84124 / US | 02 /
Santurbane, Mark 1061 South Windsor Street Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US | 03 /
Belcourt, Bill 352 Garfield Avenue Salt Lake City, UT 84115 / US | 04 /
Skrivan, Joe 402 White Rose Draper, UT 84020 / US | 05 /
Mellon, Dave 832 Martingale Lane Park City, UT 84098 / US | 06 /
Narajowski, David 722 Lakeview Drive Heber City, UT 84032 / US | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Braun, André jr., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Braun, André jr., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2005/30] | Braun, André, et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 4054 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 05001126.1 | 20.01.2005 | [2005/30] | Priority number, date | US20040538413P | 22.01.2004 Original published format: US 538413 P | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1557201 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1557201 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A63B29/02 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
A63B29/024 (EP,US);
Y10S248/925 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Title | German: | Verbesserter Klemmkeil | [2005/30] | English: | Improved active camming device | [2005/30] | French: | Coinceur | [2005/30] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.11.2009 | CY | 18.11.2009 | CZ | 18.11.2009 | DK | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | FI | 18.11.2009 | LT | 18.11.2009 | NL | 18.11.2009 | PL | 18.11.2009 | RO | 18.11.2009 | SE | 18.11.2009 | SI | 18.11.2009 | SK | 18.11.2009 | TR | 18.11.2009 | IE | 20.01.2010 | LU | 20.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | BG | 18.02.2010 | GR | 19.02.2010 | ES | 28.02.2010 | IS | 18.03.2010 | PT | 18.03.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | BE | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
LU | 20.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | BE | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | BE | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | BE | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | BE | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | BE | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | BE | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | BE | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 18.11.2009 | |
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 18.11.2009 | |
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 18.11.2009 | |
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 28.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4643377 (CHRISTIANSON TONY [US]) [X] 1-19,24-35,39-52,56,57 * the whole document *; | [A]US4832289 (WAGGONER DAVID L [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003019321 (APEZETXEA MIKEL [ES], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [XA]US2003057337 (BROWN KEVIN [GB]) [X] 1-23,40-52,54-57 * the whole document * [A] 58 | by applicant | US4643377 | US2003057337 |