EP1559563 - Portable electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/19] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Casio Computer Co., Ltd. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsui, Motoyuki 2-5-20-606, Azumacho Akishima-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Oshiro, Atsushi 3-11-17-101, Fujimoto Kokubunji-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ohtaka, Masatoshi 2224-1, Fussa Fussa-shi Tokyo / JP | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05001272.3 | 21.01.2005 | [2005/31] | Priority number, date | JP20040014505 | 22.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004014505 | JP20040111012 | 05.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004111012 | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1559563 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1559563 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/36, B41J11/04, B41J29/13 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
B41J3/36 (EP,US);
B41J15/042 (EP,US);
B41J29/023 (EP,US);
B41J29/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/17] |
Former [2005/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tragbares elektronisches Gerät | [2005/31] | English: | Portable electronic apparatus | [2005/31] | French: | Appareil electronique portable | [2005/31] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4663638 (HIROSE KUNIHIKO [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,14 * column 2, line 5 - column 5, line 26; figures 1,11 *; | [X]US6004053 (PETTERUTI STEVEN F [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,14 * column 3, line 4 - column 7, line 4; figures 3,6 *; | [X]US6118469 (HOSOMI HIROAKI [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,14* the whole document *; | [X]US6443645 (TAKEI YOSHIKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 5, line 47 - column 10, line 54; figures 4,13-15 *; | [X]US6607316 (PETTERUTI STEVEN F [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US6609844 (PETTERUTI STEVEN F [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | Examination | US4772147 |