EP1547795 - Methods and apparatus for improving inkjet print quality [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasperchik, Vladek P. 4308 NW Jon Place Corvallis OR 97330 / US | 02 /
Allen, William J. 3415 SW Cascade Avenue Corvallis OR 97333 / US | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05001323.4 | 14.05.2002 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | US20010867726 | 29.05.2001 Original published format: US 867726 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1547795 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1547795 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, B41J2/01, B41J2/21 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
B41M5/0017 (EP,US);
B41M5/0011 (EP,US);
B41M5/5236 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2005/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Verbesserung der Tintenstrahldruckqualität | [2005/26] | English: | Methods and apparatus for improving inkjet print quality | [2005/26] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour améliorer la qualité d'impression à jet d'encre | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02253368.1 / EP1262330 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPS63299970 ; | [A]US4382262 (SAVIT JOSEPH [US]) [A] 5,6 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 20 ** figure 1 *; | [AD]EP0534634 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [AD] 1-6 * abstract * * page 3, lines 1-4 * * page 6, lines 6-10 * * claims 1-10 * * figures 1-6 *; | [XDA]EP0671268 (SONY CORP [JP]) [XD] 5,6 * page 10, line 30 - line 41 * * figure 16 * [A] 1-4; | [XDA]EP0870615 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [XD] 5,6 * column 8, line 58 - column 11, line 9 * * figure 4 * [A] 1-4 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890404), vol. 013, no. 133, Database accession no. (M - 809), & JP63299970 A 19881207 (RICOH CO LTD) [AD] 1-6 * abstract * |