EP1557448 - Wet grinding process using microbeads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Opposition rejected | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | [2011/23] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Shigeru Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 02 /
Tsuchiya, Yoshimasa Dainichiseika Color & Chem. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 03 /
Takakamo, Masanori Dainichiseika Color & Chem. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 04 /
Hosoda, Tohru Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 05 /
Yoshida, Akio Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 06 /
Nakamura, Michiei Dainichiseika Color & Chem. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 07 /
Sakai, Naoyuki Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 08 /
Watanabe, Dai Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 09 /
Koiso, Hideyuki Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 10 /
Ogawa, Kenji Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/30] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05001355.6 | 24.01.2005 | [2005/30] | Priority number, date | JP20040017443 | 26.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004017443 | JP20040018437 | 27.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004018437 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1557448 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1557448 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/04 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
C09B67/0022 (EP,US);
B29C44/5636 (KR);
B29C44/3442 (KR);
C09B67/0002 (EP,US);
B29K2025/06 (KR);
B29K2105/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/16] |
Former [2005/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Nassmahlverfahren unter Verwendung von Mikrokugeln | [2005/30] | English: | Wet grinding process using microbeads | [2005/30] | French: | Broyage humide à l'usage des galets micros | [2005/30] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 12.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2008 | Observations by third parties | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2010 | Observations by third parties | 01.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.03.2012
12.03.2012
ADMISSIBLE Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London Greater London EC2A 2ES / GB Opponent's representative Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2016/10] |
Former [2012/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.03.2012
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London Greater London EC2A 2ES / GB Opponent's representative Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | 24.04.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.10.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 13.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.03.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.03.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 09.04.2019 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/23] | Appeal following opposition | 31.05.2014 | Appeal received No. T1255/14 | 31.07.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.04.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 09.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH455099 (SANDOZ AG [CH]) [Y] 1-8,13,14 * example 2 *; | [Y]GB2051108 (INMONT CORP) [Y] 1-17 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0878517 (LEXMARK INT INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6174361 (URBAN MANFRED [DE], et al) [Y] 1-17 * column 3, line 41 - line 45; example s *; | [A]EP1270680 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM [JP]) [A] 15-17* the whole document *; | [PX]US2004251329 (HSU CHING-TIEN [TW], et al) [PX] 1-8,13,14 * the whole document *; | [Y] - DONNELLY ET AL., "A comparison of zirconia ceramic grinding media", POWDER AND BULK ENGINEERING, (1994), vol. 6, pages 1 - 5, XP002329645 [Y] 1-8,13,14 * paragr. entitled 'size and shape' left col. on p.2 * | [A] - P.MUELLER, "Wet Grinding Process for Inkjet Inks", POWDER AND BULK DOT COM NEWSLETTER, (2001), vol. 3, no. 120, pages 1 - 8, XP002329646 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | Examination | US5500331 | US5969002 | other | US5500331 | US5969002 | US6166105 | US6558460 |