EP1548022 - Transition metal compound, ligand system, catalyst system and the use of the latter for the polymerisation and copolymerisation of olefins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schottek, Jörg Ginnheimer Strasse 39d 60487 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Oberhoff, Markus Mühlenstrasse 8 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | 03 /
Bingel, Carsten Müdichstrasse 30 67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 04 /
Fischer, David Am Petzenberg 2 67725 Breunigweiler / DE | 05 /
Weiss, Horst Woogstrassse 30 67141 Neuhofen / DE | 06 /
Winter, Andreas An den Brunnengärten 3 67271 Neuleiningen / DE | 07 /
Fraaije, Volker Rüsterstrasse 15 60325 Frankfurt / DE | 08 /
Maier, Ralph-Dieter Margarethenried 17a 85413 Hoergertshausen / DE | 09 /
Bidell, Wolfgang Mansions in the Park 7250 Perkins Road No. 932 Baton Rouge Louisiana 70808 / US | 10 /
Paczkowski, Nicola 9269 Kemper Grove Lane Loveland 45140 / US | 11 /
Suhm, Jürgen Wiesoppenheimer Strasse 34 a 67551 Worms / DE | 12 /
Kratzer, Roland Südhang 3 65719 Hofheim / DE | [2005/26] | Application number, filing date | 05001433.1 | 13.12.2000 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | DE1999162905 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19962905 | DE2000144983 | 11.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10044983 | [2005/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1548022 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1548022 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07F17/00, C08F10/06, C08F4/64 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/64 (KR);
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F2/001 (EP,US);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/18, C08F2500/15, C08F2500/17 (US,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/08, C08F2500/17 (US,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/14, C08F2500/17 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/18, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/21, C08F2500/15 (US,EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | Übergangsmetallverbindung, Ligandensystem, Katalysatorsystem und seine Verwendung zur Polymerisation und Copolymerisation von Olefinen | [2005/26] | English: | Transition metal compound, ligand system, catalyst system and the use of the latter for the polymerisation and copolymerisation of olefins | [2005/26] | French: | Composition de métal de transition, système de ligand, système de catalyseur et son utilisation pour la polymérisation et la copolymérisation d'oléfines | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 04.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 14.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00988791.0 / EP1250365 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000988791) is 04.08.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9840416 (TARGOR GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 16,17,19,22 * examples 1,2 ** claims 1,10,13 *; | [PX]WO0044799 (TARGOR GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1,3-5,7-11,16 * claims 9-11 * * page 22, line 27 - line 40 * * page 23, line 22 - line 26 *; | [E]WO0146274 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1,2,4,5,8,10-22 * claims 1,5 * * page 3, line 29 - line 38 * * Vergleichbeispiel 1 * * page 6, line 27 - line 30 * * page 24, line 36 - line 43 * * page 26, line 20 - line 23 *; | [E]WO0196418 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1,2,4,5,8 * page 17, line 34 - page 18, line 7 * * claims 1-8 * |