EP1566400 - Foam panel having a coating for adhesion to mortar, concrete and plaster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehrenstein, Moritz, Dr. Leuschnerstrasse 28 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Pietsch, Ines, Dr. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 4 67346 Speyer / DE | 03 /
Turznik, Gerhard, Dr. Friedhofstrasse 17 67269 Grünstadt / DE | 04 /
Schlichting, Peter, Dr. Brunhilde Strasse 31 68199 Mannheim / DE | 05 /
Ruch, Joachim, Dr. In den Backhauswiesen 9 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 06 /
Pakusch, Joachim, Dr. Obere Langgasse 30f 67346 Speyer / DE | [2005/34] | Application number, filing date | 05001655.9 | 27.01.2005 | [2005/34] | Priority number, date | DE20041008864 | 20.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004008864 | [2005/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1566400 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1566400 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1566400 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/36 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
E04B1/762 (EP);
C08J9/365 (EP);
C08J2325/06 (EP);
C08J2425/00 (EP);
C08J2433/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Title | German: | Schaumstoffplatte mit Beschichtung zur Haftung von Mörtel - Beton- und Putzsystemen | [2005/34] | English: | Foam panel having a coating for adhesion to mortar, concrete and plaster | [2005/34] | French: | Plaque de mousse ayant un revêtement d'adhésion pour mortier, béton et enduit | [2005/34] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 25.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.05.2008 | CZ | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | EE | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | IE | 28.05.2008 | LT | 28.05.2008 | PL | 28.05.2008 | RO | 28.05.2008 | SI | 28.05.2008 | SK | 28.05.2008 | TR | 28.05.2008 | BG | 28.08.2008 | SE | 28.08.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | IS | 28.09.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | HU | 29.11.2008 | GB | 27.01.2009 | LU | 27.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
GR | 29.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
HU | 29.11.2008 | ||
GB | 27.01.2009 | ||
LU | 27.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
GR | 29.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
GB | 27.01.2009 | ||
LU | 27.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
GR | 29.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
GB | 27.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
GB | 27.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
GB | 27.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | DK | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 28.05.2008 | |
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 28.05.2008 | |
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 28.05.2008 | |
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 28.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10141434 ; | [X]DE3525289 (BAEUERLE FARBEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 41 *; | [X]US5192608 (HAASL SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * claim 2 * * column 8, lines 11-16 ** column 7, lines 7-10 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10141434 A 19980529 (COSMO SOGO KENKYUSHO:KK; COSMO OIL CO LTD) [X] 1-9 * abstract * |