Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
02.03.2010 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.12.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.06.2009 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
12.06.2009 | First examination report | |
10.02.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.02.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.09.2007 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
31.05.2007 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.03.2007 | Definitive list of designations | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
14.03.2007 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.02.2007 | Change - applicant | published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] |
06.02.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.12.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
07.07.2006 | Publication of search report | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
15.07.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |