EP1569438 - Color conversion system,color conversion apparatus and color conversion program storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co. Ltd. 210 Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakami, Shigeki c/o FUJI FILM CO., LTD. 798, Miyanodai, Kisei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Kyoko c/o FUJI FILM CO., LTD. 798, Miyanodai, Kisei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | 03 /
Kinoshita, Yoshiaki c/o FUJI FILM CO., LTD. 798, Miyanodai, Kisei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | 04 /
Tamagawa, Kiyomi c/o FUJI FILM CO., LTD. 798, Miyanodai, Kisei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05001716.9 | 27.01.2005 | [2005/35] | Priority number, date | JP20040051791 | 26.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004051791 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1569438 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1569438 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
H04N1/603 (EP,US);
H04N1/6027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/16] |
Former [2005/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System, Vorrichtung und Programmspeichermedium zur Farbumsetzung | [2005/35] | English: | Color conversion system,color conversion apparatus and color conversion program storage medium | [2005/35] | French: | Système, appareil et support de stockage de programme pour la conversion de couleurs | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 10.02.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.03.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001013953 (UEKUSA AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0004] - [0009] *; | [A]EP1292113 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]US2003184812 (MINAKUTI JUN [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0062] - [0147]; figures 3,7,13 *; | [X] - R. SCOTT WILSON, "Color Management with Adobe Photoshop", NORTH STAR TRAINING, (1999), URL: http://www.northstartraining.com/PDFs/color.mgt.pdf, (20060601), XP002383555 [X] 1-10 * Section 4 - Production workflows, p.24. * |