31.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
20.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
06.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
16.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
31.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
12.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
06.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
16.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
29.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
27.06.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
13.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
16.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
29.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] |
08.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
11.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
20.07.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] |
06.07.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.07.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.02.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.01.2007 |
Change - German title |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
02.12.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.08.2006 |
First examination report |
|
09.08.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.06.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
20.06.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.03.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] |
31.01.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.09.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
24.06.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] |