EP1529796 - Photosensitive ceramic compositions containing polycarbonate polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, John Haetak 7 Lynthwaite Farm Lane Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | 02 /
Drysdale, Neville Everton 227 Welsh Tract Road Newark, Delaware 19702 / US | [2005/41] |
Former [2005/19] | 01 /
Choi, John Haetak 318 Waycross Road Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | ||
02 /
Drysdale, Neville Everton 227 Welsh Tract Road Newark, Delaware 19702 / US | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/19] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05001747.4 | 07.07.2000 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | US19990373494 | 12.08.1999 Original published format: US 373494 | [2005/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1529796 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529796 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G64/02, C08L69/00, C08K3/00, C04B35/634 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
C08G64/02 (EP,US);
C04B35/111 (EP);
C04B35/457 (EP);
C04B35/465 (EP);
C04B35/4682 (EP);
C04B35/47 (EP);
C04B35/472 (EP);
C04B35/486 (EP);
C04B35/63464 (EP);
C04B35/638 (EP);
C08G64/0291 (EP,US);
G03F7/0047 (EP,US);
G03F7/032 (EP,US);
G03F7/0388 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP);
C04B2235/3215 (EP);
C04B2235/36 (EP);
C04B2235/365 (EP);
C04B2235/5409 (EP);
C04B2235/5436 (EP);
C04B2235/6025 (EP);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K1/092 (EP,US);
Y10S430/106 (EP,US);
Y10S430/114 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/19] | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliche keramische Zusammensetzungen, die Polycarbonatpolymere enthalten | [2005/19] | English: | Photosensitive ceramic compositions containing polycarbonate polymers | [2005/19] | French: | Compositions céramiques photosensibles contenant des polymères de polycarbonate | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 24.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00114605.9 / EP1076071 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.07.2009 | GB | 13.08.2009 | DE | 02.02.2010 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/30] | FR | 31.07.2009 | |
DE | 02.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FR | 31.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5089070 (MCANDREW THOMAS P [US]) [A] 1-3 * claim 1 *; | [DA] - WEILANDT K D ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND RING-OPENING POLYMERIZATION OF 2-ACETOXYMETHYL-2- ALKYLTRIMETHYLENE CARBONATES AND OF 2-METHOXYCARBONYL-2- METHYLTRIMETHYLENE CARBONATE; A COMPARISON WITH THE POLYMERIZATION OF 2,2-DIMETHYLTRIMETHYLENE CARBONATE", MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, (199611), vol. 197, no. 11, ISSN 1022-1352, pages 3851 - 3868, XP000634319 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/macp.1996.021971128 |