EP1686564 - Bandwidth extension of bandlimited acoustic signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Goering-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iser, Bernd Uhrenmachergasse 9 89077 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Gerhard Uwe Jörg-Syrlin-Strasse 26 89081 Ulm / DE | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05001959.5 | 31.01.2005 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1686564 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1686564 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/02 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
G10L21/038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Title | German: | Bandbreitenerweiterung eines schmalbandigen akustischen Signals | [2006/31] | English: | Bandwidth extension of bandlimited acoustic signals | [2006/31] | French: | Extension de largueur de bande d'un signal acoustique à bande limitée | [2006/31] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 18.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.2009 | BE | 15.04.2009 | CY | 15.04.2009 | CZ | 15.04.2009 | DK | 15.04.2009 | EE | 15.04.2009 | FI | 15.04.2009 | IT | 15.04.2009 | LT | 15.04.2009 | NL | 15.04.2009 | PL | 15.04.2009 | RO | 15.04.2009 | SI | 15.04.2009 | SK | 15.04.2009 | TR | 15.04.2009 | BG | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | GR | 16.07.2009 | ES | 26.07.2009 | IS | 15.08.2009 | PT | 15.09.2009 | HU | 16.10.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CY | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
HU | 16.10.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CY | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | LT | 15.04.2009 | |
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 26.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0732687 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-10,12-17 * abstract * * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 27 * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]US6681202 (MIET GILES [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10,12-17 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 5 * * column 5, lines 25-30 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 3 *; | [A]US2004166820 (SLUIJTER ROBERT JOHANNES [NL], et al) [A] 1,8,9,16,17 * abstract ** page 3, paragraph 32 *; | [A] - MIET G ET AL, "Low-band extension of telephone-band speech", 2000 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP), ISTANBUL, TURKEY, (20000605), vol. 3 OF 6, ISBN 0-7803-6294-2, pages 1851 - 1854, XP002189055 [A] 1-17 * pags 1852-1853, sections 2.1-2.2 * | [A] - ISER B ET AL, "Neural Networks Versus Codebooks in an Application for Bandwidth Extension of Speech Signals", EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SPEECH COMMUNICATION AND TECHNOLOGY (EUROSPEECH), (200309), page 565, XP007006632 [A] 1-17 * abstract * |