EP1582885 - Test system with differential signal measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teradyne, Inc. 321 Harrison Avenue Boston, Massachusetts 02118 / US | [2008/34] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states TERADYNE, INC. 321 Harrison Avenue Boston, Massachusetts 02118 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conner, George W. 5183 Corte Bocina No. 124 Camarillo, CA 93012 / US | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Geyer, Ulrich F. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05002022.1 | 01.02.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | US20040813712 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: US 813712 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1582885 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1582885 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/319, G01R19/10, H04L1/20, H03K5/08 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
G01R31/31708 (EP,US);
H04L1/242 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/24] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Prüfsystem zur Messung differentieller Signale | [2005/40] | English: | Test system with differential signal measurement | [2005/40] | French: | Système de test avec mesure des signaux différentiels | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GB, IE, IT | 19.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 06.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 06.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 06.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.05.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5210527 (SMITH DEWEY W [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * column A; figures 1-4; claims 1-12 ** column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 11 *; | [A]US5333147 (NOHARA TIMOTHY J [CA], et al) [A] 1-24 * column A; figures 1a-1d,2a-2d,4,5a,7 * * column 3, lines 8-38 *; | [A]US2003099307 (WU MIAOCHEN [US]) [A] 1-24 * column A; figures 4a,4b,5,7; claims 1-17 * * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] * |