EP1577194 - Steering apparatus for vehicle and method for controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states TOYODA KOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Hiroaki JTEKT Corporation 5-8 Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [2006/48] |
Former [2005/38] | 01 /
Kato, Hiroaki Toyoda Koki Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/38] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05002186.4 | 02.02.2005 | [2005/38] | Priority number, date | JP20040074989 | 16.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004074989 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577194 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1577194 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62D6/00 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
B62D6/003 (EP,US);
B62D5/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2006/24] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lenkeinrichtung für ein Fahrzeug und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2005/38] | English: | Steering apparatus for vehicle and method for controlling the same | [2005/38] | French: | Appareil de guidage pour véhicule et son procédé de contrôle | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 08.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002254964 ; | [A]EP1097855 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2001027893 (NISHIZAKI KATSUTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002007239 (MATSUMOTO SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030114), vol. 2003, no. 01, & JP2002254964 A 20020911 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP; TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV LAB INC) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |