EP1564717 - Reed profiler for musical instruments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bucher Markus Am Steinbruch 2 6130 Willisau / CH | [2006/35] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Bucher Markus Am Steinbruch 2 6130 Willisau / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner AG Patentanwälte Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner, Patentanwälte, Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2007/23] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/33] | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 05002272.2 | 03.02.2005 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | CH20040000234 | 16.02.2004 Original published format: CH 2342004 | [2005/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1564717 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1564717 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G10D9/02, B27J1/00 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
B27J1/00 (EP);
G10D9/035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung von Rohrblättern für Musikinstrumente | [2005/33] | English: | Reed profiler for musical instruments | [2005/33] | French: | Dispositif de grattage d'anches pour instruments de musique | [2005/33] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 22.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.08.2006 | CZ | 30.08.2006 | EE | 30.08.2006 | FI | 30.08.2006 | IE | 30.08.2006 | IS | 30.08.2006 | IT | 30.08.2006 | LT | 30.08.2006 | NL | 30.08.2006 | PL | 30.08.2006 | RO | 30.08.2006 | SI | 30.08.2006 | SK | 30.08.2006 | TR | 30.08.2006 | BG | 30.11.2006 | DK | 30.11.2006 | SE | 30.11.2006 | GR | 01.12.2006 | ES | 11.12.2006 | LU | 03.02.2007 | PT | 06.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | HU | 01.03.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 30.08.2006 | |
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
EE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IS | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
LT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
LU | 03.02.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
HU | 01.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
EE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IS | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
LT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 06.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IS | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
LT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 06.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IS | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
LT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 06.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IS | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
LT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 06.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IS | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
LT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 06.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IS | 30.08.2006 | ||
LT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 06.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IS | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IS | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IS | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3221566 (POTRATZ ROLF) [A] 1,4 * page 8, line 29 - page 10, line 28; figure 3 * * abstract *; | [A]US4572257 (LAKER EDWARD B [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US6683238 (DRISCOLL JR ROBERT W [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |