EP1669856 - Component-based software system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramco Systems Limited No. 64 Sardar Patel Road, Taramani Chennai, Tamilnadu 600 113 / IN | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sundararajan, Parthasarathy 65/1, Indira Colony Ashok Nagar Chennai, 600 083 / IN | 02 /
Jayaraman, Shyamala of "Rajeswari" No.27, Royapettah high Road Chennai 600 014 / IN | 03 /
Sathiavageeswaran, Suresh Flat No. A1 Srisakthi Flats No.37, Perumal Koil First Street Kottur Chennai 600 085 / IN | 04 /
Rajaraman, Madusudanan Old No.23, New No. 32, 1st Street 1st Lane Vyasarnagar Chennai 600 039 / IN | 05 /
Ramaswamy, Srinivasan Flat B, Ground Floor Best Nest Plaza, 12 13th Street Thillal Ganga Nagar Nanganallur Chennai 600 061 / IN | 06 /
Meenakshisundaram, Krishnamoorthy 9, Sundar Rajan Street Abhiramapuram Chennai 600 018 / IN | 07 /
Devalla, Raghuram 16, 4th Cross Street NGO Colony Adambakkam Chennai 600 088 / IN | 08 /
Ponnaiah, Shanmugavel R. 2113 Kaitlyn Court West Windsor, NJ 08550 / US | 09 /
Krishnan, Natarajan 23/4, Iswarya Flats 3rd Street Sarathy Nagar Velachery Chennai 600 042 / IN | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/27] | Goddar, Heinz J. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/24] | Clarke, Alison Clare HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05002309.2 | 03.02.2005 | [2006/24] | Priority number, date | US20040553162P | 15.03.2004 Original published format: US 553162 P | US20040553248P | 15.03.2004 Original published format: US 553248 P | US20040553247P | 15.03.2004 Original published format: US 553247 P | US20040553246P | 15.03.2004 Original published format: US 553246 P | US20040553467P | 16.03.2004 Original published format: US 553467 P | US20050029989 | 05.01.2005 Original published format: US 29989 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1669856 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1669856 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
G06F8/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Title | German: | Komponente-basiertes Softwaresystem | [2006/24] | English: | Component-based software system | [2006/24] | French: | Système logiciel à base de composants | [2006/24] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2008 | 28.02.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1202167 (INTERACTIVE OBJECTS SOFTWARE G [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2003083900 (KHRISS ISMAIL [CA], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [X] - "Introduction to WebLogic Server", INTERNET CITATION, (20040301), pages 1 - 16, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20040301201936/e-docs.bea.com /wls/docs81/intro/chap1.html, (20050630), XP002334223 [X] 1-14 * paragraph "J2EE Platform" * * paragraph "Application Depolyment Across Distributed, Heterogeneous Environments" * * paragraph "WebLogic Server Application Architecture" * |