EP1562262 - A connector and a method of mounting it to an electric device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie Aichi 510-8503 / JP | ||
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Keiichi Sumitomo Wiring Systems Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | 02 /
Kawase, Hajime Sumitomo Wiring Systems Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05002368.8 | 04.02.2005 | [2005/32] | Priority number, date | JP20040028001 | 04.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004028001 | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1562262 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1562262 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1562262 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/04 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
H01R43/205 (EP,US);
H01R12/585 (EP,US);
H01R13/41 (EP,US);
H01R13/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/15] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbinder und Verfahren zum Montieren in eine elektrische Anordnung | [2005/32] | English: | A connector and a method of mounting it to an electric device | [2005/32] | French: | Connecteur et procédé de montage à un dispositif électrique | [2005/32] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 14.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5453016 (CLARK STEPHEN L [US], et al) [X] 1,6* column 5, line 28 - line 59; figures 2-6 *; | [X]US2004005794 (YAMASHITA KAZUNORI [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044]; figures 5-8 * |