EP1561709 - Refuse receptacle with lid relieving means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SULO Umwelttechnik GmbH Bünder Strasse 85 32051 Herford / DE | [2008/17] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Sulo Umwelttechnik GmbH & Co. KG Bünder Strasse 85 32051 Herford / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pautsch, Wolf-Gunter Fuchsloch 23 32694 Dörentrup / DE | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Vallée-Thiollier, Clémence-Olivia Laure Marie LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Thiollier, Clémence-Olivia Laure Marie Cabinet Lhermet La Bigne & Remy 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/31] | Thiollier, Clémence-Olivia Laure Marie Cabinet Lhermet La Bigne & Remy 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/32] | COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & PARTNER Patentanwälte Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05002449.6 | 04.02.2005 | [2005/32] | Priority number, date | DE20041005655 | 04.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004005655 | DE20041010996 | 03.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004010996 | [2005/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561709 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561709 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/16, E05F1/10 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
E05F1/1091 (EP);
B65F1/16 (EP);
B65F2001/1669 (EP);
E05Y2201/416 (EP);
E05Y2999/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/32] | Title | German: | Müllbehälter mit Deckelentlastung | [2005/32] | English: | Refuse receptacle with lid relieving means | [2005/32] | French: | Poubelle avec couvercle de détente | [2005/32] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 31.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2005 | CY | 20.06.2012 | CZ | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | IT | 20.06.2012 | LT | 20.06.2012 | PL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | SE | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | ES | 01.10.2012 | IS | 20.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | AT | 04.02.2013 | IE | 04.02.2013 | LU | 04.02.2013 | BE | 28.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
AT | 04.02.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
AT | 04.02.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 04.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | EE | 20.06.2012 | |
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 20.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH517034 (VERZINKEREI ZUG AG [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0384484 (WEISBENDER HELMUT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* figures 1,2; claims 1-10 *; | [A]DE29802589U (METZNER JOHN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19746048 |