EP1548117 - Rice regulatory sequences for gene expression in defined wheat tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto UK Ltd. 45 Hauxton Road Trumpington Cambridge CB2 2LQ / GB | [2007/44] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Monsanto UK Ltd. 45 Hauxton Road Trumpington, Cambridge CB2 2LQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urban, Martin 4 Stockwood Court Stockwood Crescent Luton, LU1 3ST / GB | 02 /
Stratford, Rebecca 67 Oxford Road Cambridge, CB4 3PH / GB | 03 /
Hammond-Kosack, Kim 32 Riverford Close Harpenden Herts, AL5 4LV / GB | 04 /
Kemp, Richard 130 Molewood Close Cambridge, CB4 3SS / GB | 05 /
Lecocq, Pierre 58 rue Croix Claire 4550 Nandrin / BE | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Bosch, Henry Monsanto Europe S.A./N.V. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 1150 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bosch, Henry Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 Letter Box No. 1 1150 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2005/26] | Bosch, Henry Monsanto Services International 270-272 Avenue de Tervuren 1150 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 05002479.3 | 23.08.2002 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | EP20010307298 | 28.08.2001 Original published format: EP 01307298 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1548117 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1548117 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12N15/29, C07K14/415, A01H5/00 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8222 (EP,US);
C12N15/8225 (EP,US);
C12N15/8234 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | Regulatorische Sequenzen aus Reis für die Genexpression in definierten Geweben von Weizen | [2005/26] | English: | Rice regulatory sequences for gene expression in defined wheat tissue | [2005/26] | French: | Séquences régulatrices du riz pour l'expression génique dans des tissus de blé | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 16.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02767435.7 / EP1421196 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 07.02.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.10.2007 | BE | 31.10.2007 | CH | 31.10.2007 | CY | 31.10.2007 | DK | 31.10.2007 | EE | 31.10.2007 | FI | 31.10.2007 | LI | 31.10.2007 | NL | 31.10.2007 | SK | 31.10.2007 | TR | 31.10.2007 | BG | 31.01.2008 | SE | 31.01.2008 | GR | 01.02.2008 | ES | 11.02.2008 | PT | 31.03.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2009/36] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CY | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 31.10.2007 | |
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9822593 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9909190 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]EP0913469 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-15 * the whole document *; | [X] - "Oryza sativa genomic DNA, chromosome X, BAC clone: H0421H08, complete sequence.", EMBL, (20000920), Database accession no. H0421H08, URL: EBI, XP002326381 [X] 1,2,6-9 * abstract * |