EP1561554 - Board consisting of a derived timber product and method for the production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kronotec AG Haldenstrasse 12 6006 Luzern / CH | [2008/38] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states KRONOTEC AG Haldenstrasse 12 6006 Luzern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2008/38] |
Former [2005/32] | 01 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Stornebel, Kai, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | Stornebel, Kai, Dipl.-Ing., et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR, Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 05002524.6 | 07.02.2005 | [2005/32] | Priority number, date | DE20041006385 | 09.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004006385 | [2005/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561554 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561554 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/00, B32B5/20 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
B27N1/006 (EP,US);
B32B21/047 (US);
B27N3/002 (EP,US);
B27N3/005 (EP,US);
B29C44/1228 (EP,US);
B32B21/08 (EP,US);
B32B5/20 (US);
B32B2266/025 (US);
B32B2266/0278 (US);
B32B2266/08 (US);
B32B2307/3065 (US);
B32B2607/00 (US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Holzwerkstoffplatte sowie ein Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Holzwerkstoffplatte | [2005/32] | English: | Board consisting of a derived timber product and method for the production thereof | [2005/32] | French: | Plaque en matériau de bois et procédé de fabrication | [2005/32] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.06.2009
ADMISSIBLE Universität Hamburg Edmund-Siemers-Allee 1 20146 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Birken, Lars, et al, et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.06.2009
ADMISSIBLE Universität Hamburg Edmund-Siemers-Allee 1 20146 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Birken, Lars, et al, et al Eisenführ Speiser Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | 24.07.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.01.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.12.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/21] | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 17.09.2008 | CY | 17.09.2008 | CZ | 17.09.2008 | DK | 17.09.2008 | EE | 17.09.2008 | FI | 17.09.2008 | IE | 17.09.2008 | LI | 17.09.2008 | LT | 17.09.2008 | NL | 17.09.2008 | RO | 17.09.2008 | SI | 17.09.2008 | SK | 17.09.2008 | BG | 17.12.2008 | SE | 17.12.2008 | IS | 17.01.2009 | LU | 07.02.2009 | PT | 17.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | HU | 18.03.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/38] | CH | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
LI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
LU | 07.02.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
HU | 18.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 17.09.2008 | |
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
LU | 07.02.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
HU | 18.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 17.09.2008 | |
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
LU | 07.02.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 17.09.2008 | |
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CZ | 17.09.2008 | |
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CZ | 17.09.2008 | |
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | CZ | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 17.09.2008 | |
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 17.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002338373 ; | [A]JPH1015920 ; | [X]GB1069171 (PROGRESSBAU ETS) [X] 1,7,9 * page 1, column L, line 12 - line 16 *; | [X]DE4226988 (SCHMUCKER WULFRAM JOHN [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-9,11,12,14-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - line 14 * * column 2, line 26 - line 27 * * column 2, line 44 - line 52 * * column 3, line 18 - line 34 * * column 4, line 13 - line 23 *; | [X]US5554429 (IWATA RITSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,11,12,14-17 * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 16 * * column 15, line 26 - line 58 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030505), vol. 2003, no. 03, & JP2002338373 A 20021127 (KOA FUNENBAN KOGYO KK) [X] 1,7,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10015920 A 19980120 (GUN EI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |