Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7189084 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2007 | B2 | US2005181640 | 18.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004034454 | 12.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4288420B | Global Dossier | 01.07.2009 | B2 | JP2005229232 | 25.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004034454 | 12.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1564847 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2014 | B1 | EP1564847 | 17.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004034454 | 12.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1655564 | 17.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004034454 | 12.02.2004 |