EP1569175 - Data recording apparatus and data recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-20-8, Ebisu Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8554 / JP | [2014/46] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noguchi, Kiyoshige Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05002701.0 | 09.02.2005 | [2005/35] | Priority number, date | JP20040055047 | 27.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004055047 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1569175 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1569175 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/08 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
G07C5/085 (EP,US);
G07C5/0858 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2007/15] |
Former [2005/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Datenaufzeichnungsgerät und Datenaufzeichnungsverfahren | [2005/35] | English: | Data recording apparatus and data recording method | [2005/35] | French: | Appareil et méthode d'enregistrement de données | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 01.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2015213 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 23 - page 8, line 66 * * figures 1,7 *; | [Y]GB2043310 (VDO SCHINDLING) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 10 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE3147077 (RAU SWF AUTOZUBEHOER [DE]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * claim 1 * * page 11 *; | [A]US4617639 (PAINE JOHN C [US]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]US5948026 (BEEMER II DELBERT GERALD [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 35 - column 10, line 20 * * claims 1,10 * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]DE10009770 (VOITH TURBO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - column 4, line 1 * * claim 1 * | by applicant | JP2002070637 | JP2004055047 |