EP1582561 - Rubber composition for bead and pneumatic tire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED 6-9, 3-chome, Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2007/34] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED 6-9, 3-chome, Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hochi, Kazuo c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd 6-9,Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05002806.7 | 10.02.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040087216 | 24.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004087216 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1582561 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1582561 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08K7/00, C08K3/34, B60C1/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
C08K3/346 (EP,US);
C08K7/00 (EP,US);
C08K2201/016 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/346, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08K7/00, C08L21/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/24] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kautschukzusammensetzung für Kernprofil und Reifen | [2005/40] | English: | Rubber composition for bead and pneumatic tire | [2005/40] | French: | Composition de caoutchouc pour talon de pneu et pneu | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 30.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0588154 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 31 * * page 4, line 38 - line 39 *; | [Y]EP0875532 (HUBER CORP J M [US]) [Y] 1,2* abstract *; | [Y]WO0116221 (BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE INC [US]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, line 16 - line 17 *; | [X]EP1195402 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 40 - line 56 * |