EP1601108 - Decoding of LDPC (low density parity check) codes using multiplications (or additions in log-domain) for check and bit node processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/48] | Decoding LDPC (low density parity check) codes using multiplications (or additions in log-domain) for check and bit node processing | ||
[2006/01] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92618-7013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shen, Ba-Zhong 22 Wyoming 92606 Irvine CA / US | 02 /
Tran, Hau Thien 19 Purple Sage 92612 Irvine CA / US | 03 /
Cameron, Kelly Brian, Dr. 4171 Blackfin 92620 Irvine CA / US | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Jehle, Volker Armin Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/48] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch, Graf v. Stosch, Jehle Patentanwalt GmbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05002959.4 | 11.02.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | US20040567571P | 03.05.2004 Original published format: US 567571 P | US20040865556 | 10.06.2004 Original published format: US 865556 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1601108 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/11 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
H03M13/1125 (EP,US);
H03M13/1111 (EP,US);
H03M13/1117 (EP,US);
H03M13/112 (EP,US);
H03M13/255 (EP,US);
H03M13/6583 (EP,US);
H03M13/1134 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/31] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Decodierung von LDPC (low density parity check) Codes unter Verwendung von Multiplikationen (oder Additionen im Log-Bereich) für die Bit- und die Checkknotenberechnung | [2005/48] | English: | Decoding of LDPC (low density parity check) codes using multiplications (or additions in log-domain) for check and bit node processing | [2006/01] | French: | Décodage de codes LDPC utilisant des multiplications (ou des additions dans le domaine logarithmique) pour le traitement des noeuds de bits et des noeuds de controle | [2005/48] |
Former [2005/48] | Decoding LDPC (low density parity check) codes using multiplications (or additions in log-domain) for check and bit node processing | Examination procedure | 30.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 30.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/28] | 22.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CA2310186 (KSCHISCHANG FRANK [CA], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 17, paragraph 3 - page 18, paragraph 1 * * table 2.1 * * page 49 - page 51 * * page 72 - page 74 *; | [X] - ZHANG H. AND YUAN D.-F., "Low-density parity-check code (LDPC) schemes with BICM", PROC., IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY, ICCT 2003, (20030409), vol. 2, ISBN 7-5635-0686-1, pages 1148 - 1151, XP010644054 [X] 1-10 * page 1148, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 1149 * | [X] - NARAYANASWAMI R., "Coded Modulation with low density parity check codes", MASTER THESIS, TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY, (200106), page complete, XP002271230 [X] 1-10 * page 22 - page 24 * * page 25, paragraph L * | [DY] - MACKAY D. J. C., "Good error-correcting codes based on very sparse matrices", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199903), vol. 45, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 399 - 431, XP002143042 [DY] 1-10 * page 409, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/18.748992 | [Y] - NARAYANAN K. R. AND LI J., "Bandwidth efficient low density parity check coding using multi level coding and iteratvie multi stage decoding", PORC., INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON TURBO CODES AND RELATED TOPICS, (20000904), pages 165 - 168, XP009021988 [Y] 1-10 * page 166, column R * * table 1 * | [DY] - RICHARDSON T J ET AL, "The capacity of low-density parity-check codes under message-passing decoding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200102), vol. 47, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 599 - 618, XP002228426 [DY] 1-10 * page 609, column R - page 610, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/18.910577 | [Y] - WADAYAMA T., "A coded modulation scheme based on low density parity check codes", PROC., IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS, COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, (200110), vol. E84A, no. 10, ISSN 0916-8508, pages 2523 - 2527, XP001107784 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | [Y] - HAGENAUER J. ET AL., "Decoding and equalization with analog non-linear networks", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS, AEI, MILANO, IT, (199911), vol. 10, no. 6, ISSN 1124-318X, pages 659 - 680, XP000912999 [Y] 1-10 * page 661 * | [Y] - RYAN E.W., "An introduction to LDPC codes", CRC Handbook for Coding and Signal Processing for Recording Systems (B. Vasic ed.), (20030819), pages 1 - 23, URL: http://www.cseee.www.edu/wcrl/ldpc.html, (20040225), XP002336953 [Y] 1-10 * page 10 - page 15 * |