EP1571386 - Sealing assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Dichtungstechnik GmbH Eisenacher Landstrasse 70 99880 Waltershausen / DE | [2006/47] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Phoenix AG Hannoversche Strasse 88 21079 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Höft, Heiko, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Haidkoppel 20b 21224 Rosengarten / DE | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Pohl, Manfred, et al RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Kirchenhang 32b 21073 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Pohl, Manfred, et al Patentanwalt Kirchenhang 32 b 21073 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Finger, Karsten, et al Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 05003117.8 | 15.02.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | DE20041010576 | 02.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004010576 | [2005/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1571386 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1571386 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1571386 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/02 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
F16L21/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Title | German: | Dichtanordnung | [2005/36] | English: | Sealing assembly | [2005/36] | French: | Ensemble d'étanchéité | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.07.2010 | CZ | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | IE | 07.07.2010 | IT | 07.07.2010 | LT | 07.07.2010 | PL | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SI | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | ES | 18.10.2010 | IS | 07.11.2010 | PT | 08.11.2010 | GB | 15.02.2011 | LU | 15.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
GB | 15.02.2011 | ||
LU | 15.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
GB | 15.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | FI | 07.07.2010 | |
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | LT | 07.07.2010 | |
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | SI | 07.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2043802 (GUSTAVSBERG AB) [A] 2-19 * page 2, line 123 - page 3, line 3; figure 3 *; | [X]DE3136183 (WEDEKIND DENSO CHEMIE [DE]) [X] 1-21,23 * page 13, line 5 - line 12; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0188300 (WAVIN BV [NL]) [A] 2-19 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 10 *; | [X]DE3522790 (MUECHER HERMANN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-21,23 * column 4, line 15 - line 47 * * column 5, line 18 - line 27; figure 1 *; | [X]GB2331137 (GLYNWED PIPE SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 16; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0063602 (VASSALLO RES & DEV CORP [US]) [A] 2-19* page 6, line 24 - page 8, line 12; figure 2 *; | [X]WO0179737 (BIDCO PLASTIC EXTRUSION INC [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * page 5, line 8 - page 10, line 7; figure - *; | [X]US2002074741 (KNAPP MARK [US]) [X] 1-21,23 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030]; figure 2 * | Examination | DE1853047U | DE1860424U | DE1900438U | DE3136315 | DE9217222U |